EP2618565 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, DATA STRUCTURE FOR VIDEO FILES, DATA COMPRESSION DEVICE, DATA DECODING DEVICE, DATA COMPRESSION METHOD, DATA DECODING METHOD, AND DATA STRUCTURE FOR COMPRESSED VIDEO FILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8270 / JP | [2017/30] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INADA, Tetsugo c/o SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
OHBA, Akio c/o SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
SEGAWA, Hiroyuki c/o SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11824711.3 | 06.07.2011 | WO2011JP03871 | Priority number, date | JP20100204806 | 13.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010204806 | JP20100204805 | 13.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010204805 | [2013/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012035691 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2618565 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/186, G06T1/60, H04N19/119, H04N19/33, H04N19/59, H04N19/176, H04N19/96 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
G06T1/60 (US);
G06F3/011 (US);
H04N19/11 (EP,US);
H04N19/119 (EP,US);
H04N19/137 (EP,US);
H04N19/14 (EP,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/33 (EP,US);
H04N19/587 (EP,US);
H04N19/59 (EP,US);
H04N19/593 (EP,US);
H04N19/96 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/30] | H04N7/173, H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, DATENSTRUKTUR FÜR VIDEODATEIEN, DATENKOMPRESSIONSVORRICHTUNG, DATENDEKODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DATENKOMPRESSIONSVERFAHREN, DATENDEKODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND DATENSTRUKTUR FÜR KOMPRIMIERTE VIDEODATEIEN | [2013/30] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, DATA STRUCTURE FOR VIDEO FILES, DATA COMPRESSION DEVICE, DATA DECODING DEVICE, DATA COMPRESSION METHOD, DATA DECODING METHOD, AND DATA STRUCTURE FOR COMPRESSED VIDEO FILES | [2013/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, STRUCTURE DE DONNÉES POUR FICHIERS VIDÉO, DISPOSITIF DE COMPRESSION DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE DE DONNÉES, PROCÉDÉ DE COMPRESSION DE DONNÉES, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE DE DONNÉES ET STRUCTURE DE DONNÉES POUR FICHIERS VIDÉO COMPRESSÉS | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2013 | Translation filed | 05.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 26.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 20.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.11.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/14] | Divisional application(s) | EP18150093.5 / EP3334161 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - F-O DEVAUX ET AL, "Remote Interactive Browsing of Video Surveillance Content Based on JPEG 2000", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20090801), vol. 19, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2009.2022777, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 1143 - 1157, XP011268758 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2009.2022777 | [XA] - ADITYA MAVLANKAR ET AL, "Optimal slice size for streaming regions of high resolution video with virtual pan/tilt/zoom functionality", PROC. OF 15TH EUROPEAN SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE (EUSIPCO}, (20070930), doi:10.1.1.75.1021, XP055034766 [X] 1,7-10 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1.1.75.1021 | [XA] - ADITYA MAVLANKAR ET AL, "Optimal server bandwidth allocation for streaming multiple streams via P2P multicast", MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2008 IEEE 10TH WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081008), ISBN 978-1-4244-2294-4, pages 468 - 473, XP031356676 [X] 1,7-10 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,11 | [XA] - ADITYA MAVLANKAR ET AL, "Region-of-interest prediction for interactively streaming regions of high resolution video", PACKET VIDEO 2007, IEEE, PI, (20071101), ISBN 978-1-4244-0980-8, pages 68 - 77, XP031170600 [X] 1,7-10 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,11 | [A] - MAVLANKAR ADITYA ET AL, "Background extraction and long-term memory motion-compensated prediction for spatial-random-access-enabled video coding à Â", PICTURE CODING SYMPOSIUM 2009; 6-5-2009 - 8-5-2009; CHICAGO,, (20090506), XP030081851 [A] 2-11 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH11265461 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2003317110 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2003348562 (TELECOMM ADVANCEMENT ORG JAPAN, et al); | [A]JP2004234476 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]WO2005059836 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [A]WO2006006915 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) | by applicant | US6563999 |