EP2617758 - MOLDING FILM AND MOLDING TRANSFER FOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAMOTO, Mitsutaka c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
MANABE, Isao c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Kozo c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11824964.8 | 26.08.2011 | WO2011JP69264 | Priority number, date | JP20100206495 | 15.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010206495 | JP20100206493 | 15.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010206493 | [2013/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012035956 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2617758 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, B32B27/32, B32B27/08, C08K5/098, C08K5/134, C09J7/29 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29D7/01 (KR);
B32B1/00 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/06 (KR);
B32B27/08 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/325 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B41M5/025 (CN);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08K5/134 (EP,US);
C08L23/02 (KR,US);
C08L45/00 (CN);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2250/242 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2255/26 (CN);
B32B2255/28 (CN);
B32B2270/00 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/51 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B2307/54 (CN);
B32B2307/5825 (CN);
B32B2307/734 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/738 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/75 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2451/00 (EP,CN,US);
C08J2323/02 (KR);
C08J2345/00 (EP,US);
C08J2365/00 (EP,US);
C08J2423/04 (EP,US);
C08J2423/10 (EP,US);
C08L2203/16 (CN);
C08L2205/025 (CN);
C08L2205/03 (CN);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L45/00, C08L23/06 (CN);
C08L45/00, C08L23/12 (CN);
C08L45/00, C08L45/00 (CN);
C08L45/00, C08L45/00, C08K5/098 (CN); |
Former IPC [2015/40] | C08J5/18, B32B27/32 | ||
Former IPC [2013/30] | C08J5/18, B32B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | FORMUNG EINES FILMS UND FORMUNG EINER TRANSFERFOLIE | [2013/30] | English: | MOLDING FILM AND MOLDING TRANSFER FOIL | [2013/30] | French: | FILM DE MOULAGE ET FILM DE TRANSFERT DE MOULAGE | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2013 | Translation filed | 12.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 17.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/34] | 09.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6017616 (KOCHEM KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, lines 33-41; examples 5-7; claims 1,2,7,16,18 * * column 4, lines 29-31 * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 32 * * column 5, lines 49-50,63-67 * [I] 6; | [XAI]WO2004098882 (TICONA GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,5 * page 3, lines 21-22; example -; claim 1; table 1 * * page 6, lines 1-8 * [A] 2-4 [I] 6; | [XI]EP1632343 (GUNZE KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * comparative examples 1 and 5 * [I] 3-6; | [XI]EP1733874 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC [JP]) [X] 1,2 * comparative examples 1, 8 and 11-13;; examples 2-13; tables 1-3 * [I] 3-6; | [XI]EP1747882 (GUNZE KK [JP]) [X] 1,2 * comparative example 5 * [I] 3-6; | [XI]JP2007021755 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND) [X] 1-3 * comparative example 3 *[I] 4-6 | International search | [A]JP2003127287 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND); | [A]JP2005238739 (JSR CORP); | [A]JP2005254458 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND); | [X]JP2007021756 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND); | [A]JP2010031252 (POLYPLASTICS CO, et al) | by applicant | JP2001347565 | JP2004188708 | JP2005162965 | JP2006257399 | JP2007246910 | JP2008095084 |