EP2616605 - HYBRID INSULATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/30] | HEAT TRACE SYSTEM INCLUDING HYBRID COMPOSITE INSULATION | ||
[2019/02] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nVent Services GmbH Freier Platz 10 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2019/29] |
Former [2018/15] | For all designated states Pentair Flow Services AG Freier Platz 10 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2017/48] | For all designated states Pentair Thermal Management LLC 899 Broadway Street Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | ||
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Pentair Thermal Management LLC 307 Constuition Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAKKALAKAL, Franco 3423 Aspen Lake Drive Manvel, TX 77578 / US | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 11825955.5 | 15.09.2011 | WO2011US51799 | Priority number, date | US20100383258P | 15.09.2010 Original published format: US 383258 P | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012037374 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2616605 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E04C1/00, F16L59/02, F16L53/00, F16L53/30, F16L53/32, F16L53/35, F16L53/38 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
F16L53/32 (EP,US);
F16L53/30 (EP,KR,US);
F16L53/35 (EP,US);
F16L53/38 (EP,US);
F16L59/029 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T137/6416 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/36] | E04C1/00, F16L59/02, F16L53/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/30] | E04C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | HYBRID ISOLIERUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/02] | English: | HYBRID INSULATION SYSTEM | [2019/02] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ISOLATION HYBRIDE | [2019/02] |
Former [2013/30] | WÄRMESPURSYSTEM MIT EINER HYBRID-VERBUNDISOLIERUNG | ||
Former [2013/30] | HEAT TRACE SYSTEM INCLUDING HYBRID COMPOSITE INSULATION | ||
Former [2013/30] | SYSTÈME DE TRAÇAGE ÉLECTRIQUE COMPORTANT UNE ISOLATION COMPOSITE HYBRIDE | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 02.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/19] | 17.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.11.2013 | 30.09.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3151633 (SHUMAN EVERETT C) [X] 1 * column 3, line 16 - column 6, line 3; figure 1 * [Y] 2-9; | [XY]US5192039 (WILLIAMS ROBERT O [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 21; figure 6 * [Y] 2-9; | [XY]US2009205737 (DINON JOHN L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraphs [0014] - [0123]; figures 3,5 * [Y] 2-9; | [Y]US2009293350 (KANIA BRUCE G [US], et al) [Y] 7,8* the whole document *; | [Y]US2010034593 (STRONG ANDREW [GB]) [Y] 6 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6092557 (SUMNER GLEN R [US]); | [X]US2009205737 (DINON JOHN L [US], et al); | [A]US2009220223 (COLOSIMO FRANCO [IT], et al); | [Y]US2009293350 (KANIA BRUCE G [US], et al); | [Y]US2010034593 (STRONG ANDREW [GB]) | by applicant | US3151633 | US2009205737 |