Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.09.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
21.06.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |
21.06.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |
04.04.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.03.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.03.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.06.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.04.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.03.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |