EP2619562 - NONWOVEN-BASED CHEMI-CAPACITIVE OR CHEMI-RESISTIVE GAS SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NHAN, Davis-Dang W2976 Farmstead Drive Appleton, Wisconsin 54915 / US | 02 /
GAKHAR, Sudhanshu 1190 Christopher Drive 10 Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 03 /
RANGANATHAN, Sridhar 8441 Sundial Court Suwanee, Georgia 30024 / US | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11826485.2 | 08.09.2011 | WO2011IB53933 | Priority number, date | US20100886238 | 20.09.2010 Original published format: US 886238 | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012038852 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2619562 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26, G01N27/416, G01N27/22, B32B5/00, G01N17/04, G01N33/00, B32B5/02, B32B27/12, D04H1/4282, D04H3/007 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
G01N33/0047 (EP,US);
B32B5/00 (EP,US);
D04H1/42 (EP,US);
D04H1/4291 (EP,US);
D04H3/007 (EP,US);
G01N17/04 (EP,US);
G01N27/221 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (EP,US);
B32B21/02 (EP,US);
B32B21/10 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0223 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0253 (EP,US);
B32B2262/04 (EP,US);
B32B2262/06 (EP,US);
B32B2262/106 (EP,US);
B32B2262/14 (EP,US);
B32B2307/202 (EP,US);
B32B2307/204 (EP,US);
B32B2307/546 (EP,US);
B32B2307/714 (EP,US);
B32B2307/724 (EP,US);
B32B2457/00 (EP,US);
B32B2457/16 (EP,US);
B32B29/02 (EP,US);
B32B5/022 (EP,US);
B32B5/08 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
G01N2027/222 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/31] | G01N27/26, G01N27/416 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | CHEMISCH KAPAZITIVER ODER CHEMISCH RESISTIVER GASSENSOR AUF VLIESBASIS | [2013/31] | English: | NONWOVEN-BASED CHEMI-CAPACITIVE OR CHEMI-RESISTIVE GAS SENSOR | [2013/31] | French: | CAPTEUR DE GAZ CHIMIO-CAPACITIF OU CHIMIO-RÉSISTIF À BASE D'UN NON-TISSÉ | [2013/31] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 25.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 03.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5674752 (BUCKLEY LEONARD J [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,14,15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0 38] , [0 72] , [0 76]; figure 19 *; | [Y]WO2009069086 (STROEMME MARIA [SE], et al) [Y] 1-8,14,15 * columns 2, 5 - column 9 *; | [A]US2007117017 (SUGIYAMA MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-8,14,15 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 48] , [0 63] , [0 89] * | International search | [A]US2007142799 (ALES THOMAS M [US], et al); | [A]US2009321238 (NHAN DAVIS-DANG H [US], et al); | [A]US2009036012 (NHAN DAVIS-DANG H [US], et al); | [A]US2010168702 (ALES III THOMAS MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2008150556 (HAN LI [US], et al) | Examination | US2008236251 | US6902701 | - DEVAUX E ET AL, "Processing and characterization of conductive yarns by coating or bulk treatment for smart textile applications", TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF MEASUREMENT AND CONT, INSTITUTE OF MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL. DORKING, GB, (20070101), vol. 29, doi:10.1177/0142331207081726, ISSN 0142-3312, pages 355 - 376, XP009161250 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0142331207081726 |