EP2619693 - VISUAL-CUE REFINEMENT OF USER QUERY RESULTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUO, Yu-Ting c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
LI, Yi c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
WEN, Fang c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
KE, Qifa c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
SUN, Jian c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11827161.8 | 18.08.2011 | WO2011US48264 | Priority number, date | US20100890097 | 24.09.2010 Original published format: US 890097 | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012039864 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2619693 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F3/14 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
G06F16/3328 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/338 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/9535 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVERFEINERUNG FÜR BENUTZERABFRAGEERGEBNISSE | [2013/31] | English: | VISUAL-CUE REFINEMENT OF USER QUERY RESULTS | [2013/31] | French: | PERFECTIONNEMENT DES REPÈRES VISUELS DES RÉSULTATS DE REQUÊTES D'UTILISATEUR | [2013/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 08.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/49] | 03.07.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/49] | 22.07.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2026216 (INVU SERVICES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-10,12,13 * abstract * [I] 11,14,15; | [X] - ZAMIR O ET AL, "Grouper: a dynamic clustering interface to Web search results", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990511), vol. 31, no. 11-16, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 1361 - 1374, XP002164078 [X] 1-15 * section 3.2;; figure 2 * | International search | [A]US2003014403 (CHANDRASEKAR RAMAN [US], et al); | [A]US2003135725 (SCHIRMER ANDREW LEWIS [US], et al); | [A]US2005097188 (FISH EDMUND J [US]); | [A]US2005261990 (GOCHT RUSSELL [US], et al) | by applicant | EP2026216 | - "Grouper: A Dynamic Clustering Interface to Web Search Results", O. ZAMIR ET AL., Computer Networks and ISDN Systems, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING, (19990511), vol. 31, pages 1361 - 1374 |