EP2619437 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF AN INTENSIFIER PISTON IN A FUEL INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Engine Intellectual Property Company, LLC 4201 Winfield Road Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDE WALLE, Alain 1118 Cheshire Avenue Naperville, IL 60540 / US | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 11827413.3 | 21.09.2011 | WO2011US52484 | Priority number, date | US20100385590P | 23.09.2010 Original published format: US 385590 P | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012040285 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2619437 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02M37/08 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
F02D41/20 (EP,US);
F02M51/061 (US);
F02M57/025 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US);
F02D2041/2058 (EP,US);
F02D2041/2079 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES BETRIEBS EINES INTENSIVIERUNGSKOLBENS IN EINEM KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZER | [2013/31] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF AN INTENSIFIER PISTON IN A FUEL INJECTOR | [2013/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN PISTON MULTIPLICATEUR DE PRESSION DANS UN INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT | [2013/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 03.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5494219 (MALEY DALE C [US], et al); | [A]US2002145054 (BECKER JOERG CHRISTOPH [US], et al); | [A]US6604507 (LEI NING [US], et al); | [A]US7216630 (MARTIN STEFFEN [US], et al); | [A]US2008127918 (WINELAND RICHARD [US], et al); | [Y]US2008203183 (ELIE LARRY [US], et al) |