EP2640405 - HUMAN-ADAPTED HA POLYPEPTIDES, VACCINES, AND INFLUENZA TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge MA 02142 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMAN, Rahul 132 Clocktower Drive Unit 311 Waltham, MA 02452 / US | 02 /
KOH, Xiaoying 56 Webster Avenue Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | 03 /
VISWANATHAN, Karthik 3114 Stearns Hill Road Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 04 /
SASISEKHARAN, Ram 4 Duval Way Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 05 /
CHANDRASEKARAN, Aarthi 243 Buena Vista Avenue, 902 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11827500.7 | 21.09.2011 | WO2011US52670 | Priority number, date | US20100384780P | 21.09.2010 Original published format: US 384780 P | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012040406 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2640405 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, C07K1/00, C12P21/06, C40B40/12, C07K14/005, A61K39/12, A61K39/145 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (US);
A61K39/145 (US);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K16/1018 (US);
C12N7/00 (US);
G01N33/56983 (US);
C12N2760/16122 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/39] | A61K38/00, C07K1/00, C12P21/06, C40B40/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | AN DEN MENSCHEN ANGEPASSTE HA-POLYPEPTIDE, IMPFSTOFFE DARAUS UND INFLUENZA-BEHANDLUNG DAMIT | [2013/39] | English: | HUMAN-ADAPTED HA POLYPEPTIDES, VACCINES, AND INFLUENZA TREATMENT | [2013/39] | French: | TRAITEMENT ET/OU CARACTÉRISATION DE LA GRIPPE ; POLYPEPTIDES HA ADAPTÉS À L'HOMME | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 12.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 01.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - KARTHIK VISWANATHAN ET AL, "Glycans as receptors for influenza pathogenesis", GLYCOCONJUGATE JOURNAL, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20100824), vol. 27, no. 6, ISSN 1573-4986, pages 561 - 570, XP019818965 [A] 1-15 * page 563, column right - page 568; figure 1 * | [A] - SHRIVER Z ET AL, "Context-Specific Target Definition in Influenza A Virus Hemagglutinin-Glycan Receptor Interactions", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, vol. 16, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.CHEMBIOL.2009.08.002, ISSN 1074-5521, (20090828), pages 803 - 814, (20090827), XP026521536 [A] 1-15 * page 809 - page 812; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2009.08.002 | [A] - M Matrosovich ET AL, "Influenza A virus isolate A/Albany/6/58 (H2N2)) hemagglutinin gene, pa - Nucleotide - NCBI", (20000523), URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/nuccore/AF270723?%3Fdb=nucleotide, (20150303), XP055173512 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2008241918 (SASISEKHARAN ET AL.); | [A]US2009081193 (SASISEKHARAN ET AL.); | [A]US2010061990 (SASISEKHARAN ET AL.); | [Y] - PAPPAS ET AL., "Receptor Specificity and Transmission of H2N2 Subtype Viruses Isolated from the Pandemic of 1957.", PLOS ONE., (201006), vol. 5, no. 6, page E11158, XP055136851 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0011158 | [A] - "HEMAGGLUTININ PRECURSOR", SWISS-PROT, (20061128), XP055150695 | [A] - MATROSOVICH ET AL., "Early Alterations of the Receptor-Binding Properties of H1, H2, and H3 Avian Influenza Virus Hemagglutinins after Their Introduction into Mammals.", J VIROL., (2000), vol. 74, no. 18, pages 8502 - 8512, XP002503150 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.74.18.8502-8512.2000 | [XP] - VISWANATHAN ET AL., "Determinants of Glycan Receptor Specificity of H2N2 Influenza A Virus Hemagglutinin.", PLOS ONE., (201010), vol. 5, no. 10, page E13768, XP055136249 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0013768 |