EP2624306 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SOLAR CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/47] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHAMA, Tsuyoshi c/o SANYO ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 5-5 Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Hiroyuki c/o SANYO ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 5-5 Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 03 /
TAMOTO, Kei c/o SANYO ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 5-5 Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11828641.8 | 11.08.2011 | WO2011JP68374 | Priority number, date | JP20100215917 | 27.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010215917 | [2013/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012043080 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2624306 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/04, H01L31/18, H01L31/0224, H01L31/068, H01L31/0747, H01L31/20 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
H01L31/022441 (EP,US);
H01L31/02363 (US);
H01L31/0682 (EP,US);
H01L31/0747 (EP,US);
H01L31/1804 (EP,US);
H01L31/202 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/32] | H01L31/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SOLARZELLEN | [2013/32] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SOLAR CELL | [2013/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLULE SOLAIRE | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2013 | Translation filed | 17.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 13.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 18.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2008010746 (SHARP KK) [X] 1-4,11* abstract *; | [X]WO2009096539 (KYOCERA CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11 * abstract *; | [XI]US2010224251 (FUNAKOSHI YASUSHI [JP]) [X] 1-5,8-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0063] - [0080] * [I] 6,7; | [XI]US2010236613 (LEE JONG-JAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] - [0046] * [I] 5-7; | [XP]EP2239788 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-4,8-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] , [0 36] , [0 45] - [0077] - [0 99] , [ 113] * | International search | [A]JP2006324590 (SHARP KK); | [X]JP2008010746 (SHARP KK); | [AP]WO2010113750 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2010080887 |