EP2624374 - CONNECTOR AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hosiden Corporation 4-33, Kitakyuhoji 1-chome Yao-shi, Osaka 581-0071 / JP | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGATA, Takayuki c/o HOSIDEN CORPORATION 4-33, Kitakyuhoji 1-chome Yao-shi, Osaka 581-0071 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Hideto c/o HOSIDEN CORPORATION Tokyo Factory 329, Toyazuka-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372-0825 / JP | [2016/46] |
Former [2016/40] | 01 /
NAGATA, Takayuki c/o HOSIDEN CORPORATION 4-33, Kitakyuhoji 1-chome Yao-shi, Osaka 581-0071 / JP | ||
02 /
KOBAYASHI, Hideto c/o HOSIDEN CORPORATION Tokyo Factory 329 Toyazuka-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-0825 / JP | |||
Former [2013/32] | 01 /
NAGATA, Takayuki c/o HOSIDEN CORPORATION 4-33 Kitakyuhoji 1-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0071 / JP | ||
02 /
KOBAYASHI, Hideto c/o HOSIDEN CORPORATION Tokyo Factory 329 Toyazuka-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-0825 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2016/46] |
Former [2013/32] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11829095.6 | 27.09.2011 | [2016/46] | WO2011JP72038 | Priority number, date | JP20100217669 | 28.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010217669 | [2013/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012043542 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2624374 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2624374 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/6594, // H01R13/516, H01R13/627, H01R13/506, H01R13/6596, H01R12/72 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
H01R13/6594 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/648 (KR,US);
H01R12/724 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/506 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/516 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/6271 (KR,US);
H01R13/6596 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/32] | H01R13/648 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STECKVERBINDER UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2013/32] | English: | CONNECTOR AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2013/32] | French: | CONNECTEUR ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2013 | Translation filed | 29.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 25.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2011 | AL | 16.11.2016 | AT | 16.11.2016 | BE | 16.11.2016 | CY | 16.11.2016 | CZ | 16.11.2016 | DK | 16.11.2016 | EE | 16.11.2016 | ES | 16.11.2016 | FI | 16.11.2016 | HR | 16.11.2016 | LT | 16.11.2016 | LV | 16.11.2016 | MC | 16.11.2016 | MK | 16.11.2016 | NL | 16.11.2016 | PL | 16.11.2016 | RO | 16.11.2016 | RS | 16.11.2016 | SI | 16.11.2016 | SK | 16.11.2016 | SM | 16.11.2016 | TR | 16.11.2016 | BG | 16.02.2017 | NO | 16.02.2017 | GR | 17.02.2017 | IS | 16.03.2017 | PT | 16.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 27.09.2011 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
TR | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 27.09.2011 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 27.09.2011 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.09.2011 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 16.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO0106603 (MOLEX INC [US]) [I] 1,3,4 * figures 1,2,3,8 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 10 * * page 14, lines 17-21 * * page 23, lines 1-10 * [Y] 2; | [Y]US6210237 (CHANG YAO HAO [TW]) [Y] 2 * figure 1 *; | [A]US6540563 (HU JINKUI [CN], et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 2-5 * * column 3, lines 40-64 *; | [A]US2004018772 (ZHANG YONG [CN], et al) [A] 1-4* abstract *; | [A]US2004157491 (LIN TUNG-CHANG [TW]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]EP1626464 (HIROSE ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0021] , [0024] , [0025] *; | [A]US2009305555 (WANG LI-JIANG [CN], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0026] , [0033] , [0034]; figures 1-8 * | International search | [A]JPH02150682U (HOSIDEN ELECTRONIC CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH08106961 (SMK KK); | [A]JP2009193858 (YAZAKI CORP); | [A]JP2011060613 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON) | by applicant | JPH08106961 |