EP2623242 - CUTTING INSERT AND CUTTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tungaloy Corporation 11-1, Yoshima-Kogyodanchi Iwaki-shi Fukushima 970-1144 / JP | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHAGATH Kedar Suresh c/o TUNGALOY CORPORATION 11-1 Yoshima-Kogyodanchi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 970-1144 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGUCHI Takashi c/o TUNGALOY CORPORATION 11-1 Yoshima-Kogyodanchi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 970-1144 / JP | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/31] |
Former [2013/32] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11829132.7 | 27.09.2011 | [2021/31] | WO2011JP72111 | Priority number, date | JP20100214801 | 27.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010214801 | [2013/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012043579 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2623242 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2623242 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/20, B23C5/06, B23C5/10 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
B23B27/007 (EP,US);
B23C5/202 (EP,US);
B23B27/145 (EP,US);
B23B27/1607 (US);
B23B27/1611 (US);
B23C5/06 (EP,US);
B23C5/205 (US);
B23B2200/0409 (EP,US);
B23B2200/0447 (EP,US);
B23B2200/202 (EP,US);
B23B2200/204 (EP,US);
B23C2200/0444 (EP,US);
B23C2200/125 (EP,US);
B23C2200/201 (US);
B23C2200/203 (EP,US);
B23C2200/205 (EP,US);
B23C2200/208 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1906 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEEINSATZ UND SCHNEIDEWERKZEUG | [2013/32] | English: | CUTTING INSERT AND CUTTING TOOL | [2013/32] | French: | PLAQUETTE DE COUPE ET OUTIL DE COUPE | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2013 | Translation filed | 27.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 05.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2019 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2011 | AL | 04.08.2021 | AT | 04.08.2021 | CY | 04.08.2021 | CZ | 04.08.2021 | DK | 04.08.2021 | EE | 04.08.2021 | ES | 04.08.2021 | FI | 04.08.2021 | HR | 04.08.2021 | IT | 04.08.2021 | LT | 04.08.2021 | LV | 04.08.2021 | MC | 04.08.2021 | MK | 04.08.2021 | MT | 04.08.2021 | NL | 04.08.2021 | PL | 04.08.2021 | RO | 04.08.2021 | RS | 04.08.2021 | SE | 04.08.2021 | SI | 04.08.2021 | SK | 04.08.2021 | SM | 04.08.2021 | TR | 04.08.2021 | IE | 27.09.2021 | LU | 27.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | CH | 30.09.2021 | LI | 30.09.2021 | FR | 04.10.2021 | BG | 04.11.2021 | GB | 04.11.2021 | NO | 04.11.2021 | GR | 05.11.2021 | IS | 04.12.2021 | PT | 06.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.09.2011 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
TR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 27.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 04.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GB | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.09.2011 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 27.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 04.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GB | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 27.09.2011 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 27.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 04.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GB | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 27.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 04.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GB | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 27.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 04.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GB | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/41] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 27.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 04.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 27.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 27.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 27.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 27.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3289271 (STIER HENRY W) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]JP2003275920 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [A]WO2008078892 (KORLOY INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [XDI]WO2008120186 (ISCAR LTD [IL], et al) [XD] 1,7-13 * page 9, lines 4-11 - lines 16-21; figures 4,5,6,7,8 * [I] 2-6 | International search | [Y]US3289271 (STIER HENRY W); | [Y]JP2008544872 (ESKAR LTD.) | by applicant | WO2008120186 | WO2008120188 |