EP2793333 - INTERCONNECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTERCONNECTING UMBILICALS FOR TRANSMITTING POWER, FLUIDS AND/OR DATA IN A MARINE ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/43] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTERCONNECTING UMBILICALS FOR CONVEYING ENERGY, FLUIDS AND/OR DATA IN A MARINE ENVIRONMENT | ||
[2017/02] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUNDACIÓN TECNALIA RESEARCH & INNOVATION Parque Tecnologico de San Sebastian Mikeletigi Pasalekua, 2 20009 San Sebastian (Guipuzcoa) / ES | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICO RUBIO, Antonio Parque Tecnológico de San Sebastián Mikeletegi Pasealekua 2 E-20009 San Sebastian (Guipúzcoa) / ES | 02 /
VILLATE MARTÍNEZ, José, Luis Parque Tecnológico de San Sebastián Mikeletegi Pasealekua 2 E-20009 San Sebastian (Guipúzcoa) / ES | 03 /
RUIZ MINGUELA, Pablo Parque Tecnológico de San Sebastián Mikeletegi Pasealekua 2 E-20009 San Sebastian (Guipúzcoa) / ES | 04 /
RICCI, Pierpaolo Parque Tecnológico de San Sebastián Mikeletegi Pasealekua 2 E-20009 San Sebastian (Guipúzcoa) / ES | 05 /
IBAÑEZ EREÑO, Pedro Parque Tecnológico de San Sebastián Mikeletegi Pasealekua 2 E-20009 San Sebastian (Guipúzcoa) / ES | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 11830093.8 | 12.12.2011 | WO2011ES70853 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013087948 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | ES | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2793333 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02G1/10, H02G9/02, H02G15/14 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
H02G1/10 (EP,US);
F16L1/123 (US);
F16L1/16 (EP,US);
F16L1/26 (EP,US);
H01R13/523 (EP,US);
H02G15/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG VON VERSORGUNGSKABELN ZUM FÖRDERN VON ENERGIE, FLÜSSIGKEITEN UND/ODER DATEN IN EINER MEERESUMGEBUNG | [2014/43] | English: | INTERCONNECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTERCONNECTING UMBILICALS FOR TRANSMITTING POWER, FLUIDS AND/OR DATA IN A MARINE ENVIRONMENT | [2017/02] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'INTERCONNEXION D'OMBILICAUX POUR LA TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE, DE FLUIDES ET/OU DE DONNÉES EN ENVIRONNEMENT MARIN | [2014/43] |
Former [2014/43] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTERCONNECTING UMBILICALS FOR CONVEYING ENERGY, FLUIDS AND/OR DATA IN A MARINE ENVIRONMENT | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2014 | Translation filed | 12.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 03.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/45] | 21.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003021556 (TOTH JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2110910 (OPENHYDRO GROUP LTD [IE]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010038090 (BARRATT RICHARD K O [US], et al) [A] 1,8* the whole document *; | [AD]EP2237380 (NEXANS [FR]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2237380 |