Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
07.03.2017 | Change - representative | |
06.12.2016 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.11.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.03.2016 | Change - classification | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
04.03.2016 | Change - classification | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
04.03.2016 | Change - date of supplementary search report | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
14.08.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.11.2014 | Change - representative | |
30.08.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.08.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.07.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
12.07.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
27.06.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.06.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.06.2013 | New entry: Fee payment for extension state | |
15.04.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.04.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.04.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |