Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9404343 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2016 | B2 | US2013199790 | 08.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011CA01121 | 04.10.2011 | US39008610 | 05.10.2010 | US201113877758 | 04.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011313769 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011CA01121 | 04.10.2011 | US39008610 | 05.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2625380 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2016 | A4 | EP2625380 | 14.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011CA01121 | 04.10.2011 | US39008610 | 05.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013009240 | 26.07.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2011CA01121 | 04.10.2011 | US39008610 | 05.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2813690 | 12.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011CA01121 | 04.10.2011 | US39008610 | 05.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012045156 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39008610 | 05.10.2010 |