EP2625380 - WIRELINE CONVEYED APPARATUS FOR WELLBORE FLUID TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Packers Plus Energy Services Inc. Bow Valley Square 2 Suite 2200, 205 - 5 Avenue SW Calgary, Alberta T2P 2V7 / CA | [2013/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THEMIG, Daniel Jon 256 Woodhaven Place SW Calgary Alberta T2W 5P9 / CA | 02 /
FEHR, James 31 Woodfield Drive Sherwood Park, Alberta T8A 4A1 / CA | 03 /
ARABSKY, Serhiy 3204 - 62 Street Beaumont Alberta T4X 1T6 / CA | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Marles, Alan David Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BG / GB | Application number, filing date | 11830153.0 | 04.10.2011 | WO2011CA01121 | Priority number, date | US20100390086P | 05.10.2010 Original published format: US 390086 P | [2013/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012045156 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2625380 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 12.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/14, E21B23/14, E21B43/14, E21B43/26 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
E21B34/14 (EP,US);
E21B23/14 (EP,US);
E21B33/124 (EP,US);
E21B43/14 (EP,US);
E21B2200/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Extension states | BA | 02.05.2013 | ME | 02.05.2013 | Title | German: | KABELGEBUNDENE GEFÖRDERTE VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEARBEITUNG VON BOHRLOCHFLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2013/33] | English: | WIRELINE CONVEYED APPARATUS FOR WELLBORE FLUID TREATMENT | [2013/33] | French: | APPAREIL DÉPLACÉ PAR CÂBLE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN PUITS DE FORAGE PAR FLUIDE | [2013/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 11.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 24.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4913227 (WITTRISCH CHRISTIAN [FR]) [A] 1,11* column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 18; figure - *; | [A]US5947213 (ANGLE COLIN M [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 20, line 33 - column 21, line 32; figures 16,17 *; | [XA]US7387165 (LOPEZ DE CARDENAS JORGE [US], et al) [X] 11-14 * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 8; figures 11A-E * [A] 1-10,15-17; | [XA]US2010108323 (WILKIN JAMES F [CA]) [X] 11-14 * paragraph [0024]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038]; figures 7A-E * [A] 1-10,15-17 | International search | [A]US2999545 (BIGELOW HERBERT L); | [A]US4729429 (WITTRISCH CHRISTIAN [FR]); | [X]US4940094 (LESSI JACQUES [FR], et al); | [A]WO9209784 (PHOENIX PETROLEUM SERVICES [GB]); | [A]US5957206 (PATEL DINESH R [US]) |