EP2626285 - VEHICLE SAFETY ANTI-COLLISION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzhou Eagle Electric Vehicle Manufacturing Co., Ltd No. 699 Tongyuan Road Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | [2013/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xueqing No 699, Tongyuan Road Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215000 / CN | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11830184.5 | 08.07.2011 | WO2011CN01125 | Priority number, date | CN20101299396 | 08.10.2010 Original published format: CN201010299396 | [2013/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012045228 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2626285 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B62J27/00, B60R19/02, B60R19/04 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
B60R19/02 (EP,US);
B62J27/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Title | German: | ANTIKOLLISIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGSICHERHEIT | [2013/33] | English: | VEHICLE SAFETY ANTI-COLLISION DEVICE | [2013/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTICOLLISION DE SÉCURITÉ POUR VÉHICULE | [2013/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2013 | Translation filed | 02.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 21.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 17.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3897095 (GLANCE PATRICK M, et al) [X] 1,8 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 14; figures 1,2 * [I] 2-5,9,10; | [A]US3933387 (SALLOUM ROBERT J, et al) [A] 1,4,5,8 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 13; figures 1,4,5,8 *; | [A]JPH10141408 (POLYURETHAN KASEI KK) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]US2003030290 (YAMAGIWA TOSHIO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB634838 (CECIL GILBERT VALE ONSLOW) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * | International search | [A]CN2420186Y (MAO ZHENHUA [CN]); | [A]KR20020052914 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN1362342 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US6817638 (CHOI WON-JUN [KR], et al); | [A]JP2005082036 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP); | [A]CN1883983 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]CN201825172U (SUZHOU EAGLE ELEC VEHICLE MFG) |