EP2622674 - FE-V REDOX FLOW BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Battelle Memorial Institute PO Box 999 M/S K1-53 Richland, Washington 99352 / US | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Liyu 2830 Hawkstone Court Richland Washington 99354 / US | 02 /
KIM, Soowhan 250 Gage Blvd. Apt 3064 Richland Washington 99352 / US | 03 /
YANG, Zhenguo 2926 Rock Creek Court Richland Washington 99354 / US | 04 /
WANG, Wei 1214 Fontana Court Richland Washington 99354 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Jianlu 2000 Stevens Drive Apt. 207 Richland Washington 99352 / US | 06 /
CHEN, Baowei 503 Buckboard Court Richland Washington 99354 / US | 07 /
NIE, Zimin 2860 Hawkstone Court Richland Washington 99354 / US | 08 /
XIA, Guanguang 5411 Texada Lane Pasco Washington 99301 / US | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Bond, Christopher William Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Bond, Christopher William Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11831068.9 | 08.06.2011 | WO2011US39624 | Priority number, date | US20100892698 | 28.09.2010 Original published format: US 892698 | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012047319 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2622674 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/18, H01M8/20, // H01M2/16 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
H01M8/188 (EP,US);
H01M8/18 (KR);
H01M8/184 (US);
H01M50/426 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/20 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0005 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/32] | H01M8/18, H01M8/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Title | German: | FE-V REDOX-FLUSSBATTERIE | [2013/32] | English: | FE-V REDOX FLOW BATTERIES | [2013/32] | French: | BATTERIES REDOX FE-V | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 11.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/52] | 23.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3996064 (THALLER LAWRENCE H) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 5, lines 41-54 * * claims 1,3-6 *; | [XI]JPH0419966 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN) [X] 1-4,8-10,12,13 * abstract * * claim - * * sections "Means to solve the problems","Effect of the invention", "Application examples", "Brief explanation of the drawings" * * table 1 * * figure - * [I] 5-7,11,14,15; | [A]WO9306626 (UNISEARCH LTD [AU]) [A] 5-7 * abstract * * page 7, lines 9-14 * * page 11, lines 2-29 * * claim - *; | [A] - MOHAMMADI T ET AL, "Use of polyelectrolyte for incorporation of ion-exchange groups in composite membranes for vanadium redox flow battery applications", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, (19950701), vol. 56, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0378-7753(95)80014-8, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 91 - 96, XP004044372 [A] 5-7 * abstract * * sections "1.Introduction", "2.Experimental", "4.Conclusions" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-7753(95)80014-8 | [T] - WEI WANG ET AL, "A new redox flow battery using Fe/V redox couples in chloride supporting electrolyte", ENERGY & ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE, (20110808), vol. 4, no. 10, doi:10.1039/c0ee00765j, ISSN 1754-5692, pages 4068 - 4073, XP055116247 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0ee00765j | International search | [A]US4786567 (SKYLLAS-KAZACOS MARIA [AU], et al); | [A]US4814241 (NAGASHIMA IKUO [JP], et al); | [A]US2008292964 (KAZACOS GEORGE CHRISTOPHER [AU], et al) |