EP2629249 - POSITION INFORMATION AGGREGATION DEVICE AND POSITION INFORMATION AGGREGATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, Inc. 11-1 Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2013/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI Motonari c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
TERADA Masayuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
OKAJIMA Ichiro c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 11832607.3 | 13.10.2011 | WO2011JP73590 | Priority number, date | JP20110022950 | 04.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011022950 | JP20100230690 | 13.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010230690 | [2013/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012050176 | Date: | 19.04.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2629249 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
G06F17/40 (KR);
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG VON POSITIONSINFORMATIONEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG VON POSITIONSINFORMATIONEN | [2013/34] | English: | POSITION INFORMATION AGGREGATION DEVICE AND POSITION INFORMATION AGGREGATION METHOD | [2013/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AGRÉGATION D'INFORMATION DE POSITION ET PROCÉDÉ D'AGRÉGATION D'INFORMATION DE POSITION | [2013/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2013 | Translation filed | 04.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 04.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003014213 (YOKOTA YOICHI [JP]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0012] - [0 40] - [0078] *; | [D]JP2003030373 (FUJITSU LTD) [D] * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2003122877 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2003030373 (FUJITSU LTD) | by applicant | JP2003030373 | JP2005286657 |