EP2628268 - METHOD OF TRANSMTITING AND RECEIVING ACK/NACK SIGNAL AND APPARATUS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pantech Corporation 10F, 251, Gangnam-daero Seocho-gu Seoul 06735 / KR | [2022/36] |
Former [2020/36] | For all designated states Pantech Corporation 8 Yangjaecheonro-21 gil, Suite 402 Seocho-gu Seoul 06748 / KR | ||
Former [2017/34] | For all designated states GoldPeak Innovations Inc. Suite 806, Digital-ro 34-gil 55, Guro-gu Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states Pantech Inc. Pantech Bldg. 179 Seongam-Ro Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2013/34] | For all designated states Pantech Co., Ltd Pantech R&D Center 1-2, DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-270 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Dong Hyun Pantech Bldg. I-2 DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-270 / KR | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2023/08] |
Former [2013/34] | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11832776.6 | 14.10.2011 | [2023/08] | WO2011KR07659 | Priority number, date | KR20100100988 | 15.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100100988 | [2013/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012050389 | Date: | 19.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2628268 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2628268 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04J11/00 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
H04L5/0055 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1861 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1812 (KR,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0057 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN UND EMPFANGEN VON ACK/NACK-SIGNALEN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2013/34] | English: | METHOD OF TRANSMTITING AND RECEIVING ACK/NACK SIGNAL AND APPARATUS THEREOF | [2013/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION D'UN SIGNAL ACK/NACK ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2013/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 14.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2020 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 17.03.2016 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2016/47] | 01.03.2017 | Resumption of proceedings | [2017/06] | 17.03.2016 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2017/06] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.02.2023 | CZ | 22.02.2023 | DK | 22.02.2023 | EE | 22.02.2023 | ES | 22.02.2023 | FI | 22.02.2023 | HR | 22.02.2023 | IT | 22.02.2023 | LT | 22.02.2023 | LV | 22.02.2023 | MC | 22.02.2023 | NL | 22.02.2023 | PL | 22.02.2023 | RO | 22.02.2023 | RS | 22.02.2023 | SE | 22.02.2023 | SI | 22.02.2023 | SK | 22.02.2023 | SM | 22.02.2023 | NO | 22.05.2023 | GR | 23.05.2023 | IS | 22.06.2023 | PT | 22.06.2023 | LU | 14.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
IT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 14.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
IT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
IT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
IT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "PUCCH resources for multi-bit ACK", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-105557 PUCCH RESOURCES FOR MULTI-BIT ACK, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101005), vol. RAN WG1, no. Xi'an; 20101011, XP050450657 [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0003] * | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical layer procedures (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.213, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100610), no. V9.2.0, pages 1 - 80, XP050441595 [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [5.1.1.1] * * paragraph [7.1.6] * * paragraph [7.1.7] * * paragraph [07.3] * * paragraph [08.6] * | [X] - MCC SUPPORT, "Final Report of 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #62 v1.0.0", 3GPP DRAFT; FINAL_REPORTWG1#62_V100, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101014), vol. RAN WG1, no. Xi' an, China; 201010, XP050489285 [X] 1-15 * page 19, paragraph 6.2.2.1 * * page 21 * * page 23 - page 24 * * page 27 * * page 30 * * page 51 * * page 54 * | [I] - SAMSUNG, "HARQ-ACK Resource Indication in PUCCH for DL CA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-105359 PUCCH A_N RESOURCE INDEXING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101005), vol. RAN WG1, no. Xi'an; 20101011, XP050450510 [I] 1-15 * column 1 * * column 2 * | [I] - CATT, "Resource Allocation for PUCCH Format 3", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-105153, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101005), vol. RAN WG1, no. Xi'an; 20101011, XP050450371 [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [03.2] * | International search | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "PUCCH HARQ-ACK Resource Mapping for DL CA", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #61BIS, R1-103637, (20100628), pages 1 - 3, XP050449095 | [Y] - FUJITSU, "Channel Selection for A/N feedback in CA", 3GPP TSG-RAN1 #62, R1-104875, (20100823), pages 1 - 5, XP050450162 | [A] - HUAWEI, "Resource allocation for uplink ACK/NACK multiplexing", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #62, R1-104282, (20100823), XP050449651 | [A] - CATT, "ACK/NACK resource allocation for CA", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #62, R1-104312, (20100823), XP050449670 | Examination | - SAMSUNG, "PUCCH HARQ-ACK Resource Mapping for DL CA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-103637 PUCCH A_N RESOURCE INDEXING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100622), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20100628, XP050449095 |