EP2627526 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VENTILATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2019/50] |
Former [2013/34] | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LILJESTRAND, Andreas Liljewalchsgatan 39 5 tr S-151 45 Södertälje / SE | 02 /
BREMBERG, Per Blomstervägen 6 S-151 60 Södertälje / SE | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Scania CV AB Patents, GP 117kv 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 11832835.0 | 03.10.2011 | [2019/50] | WO2011SE51173 | Priority number, date | SE20100051078 | 15.10.2010 Original published format: SE 1051078 | [2013/34] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012050508 | Date: | 19.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2627526 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2627526 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, F01N3/023 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
B60H1/00764 (EP);
B60H1/00849 (EP,SE);
F01N3/023 (EP,SE)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES BELÜFTUNGSSYSTEMS | [2013/34] | English: | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VENTILATION SYSTEM | [2013/34] | French: | AGENCEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER UN SYSTÈME DE VENTILATION | [2013/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 18.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.10.2011 | AL | 11.12.2019 | AT | 11.12.2019 | CY | 11.12.2019 | CZ | 11.12.2019 | DK | 11.12.2019 | EE | 11.12.2019 | ES | 11.12.2019 | FI | 11.12.2019 | HR | 11.12.2019 | IT | 11.12.2019 | LT | 11.12.2019 | LV | 11.12.2019 | MC | 11.12.2019 | MK | 11.12.2019 | MT | 11.12.2019 | NL | 11.12.2019 | PL | 11.12.2019 | RO | 11.12.2019 | RS | 11.12.2019 | SE | 11.12.2019 | SI | 11.12.2019 | SK | 11.12.2019 | SM | 11.12.2019 | TR | 11.12.2019 | BG | 11.03.2020 | NO | 11.03.2020 | GR | 12.03.2020 | IS | 11.04.2020 | PT | 06.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.10.2011 | |
AL | 11.12.2019 | ||
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CY | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
MT | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | ES | 11.12.2019 | |
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 11.12.2019 | |
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 11.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE10333344 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]); | [A]EP1882829 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]US5946923 (SAMUKAWA KATSUHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008157099 (MITSUBISHI FUSO TRUCK & BUS) | by applicant | DE10333344 |