EP2621798 - NAVIGATED URBAN FLOATING OFFICE OR RESIDENTIAL STRUCTURE FOR INDEPENDENT PARTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aharonian, Gregory 4 Westlund Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Aharonian, Gregory 4 Westland Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11833056.2 | 28.09.2011 | WO2011US53721 | Priority number, date | US20100387835P | 29.09.2010 Original published format: US 387835 P | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012050903 | Date: | 19.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2621798 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B63B35/44 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
B63B35/00 (EP,US);
G01C21/203 (EP,US);
B63B35/44 (US);
B63B35/54 (US);
B63B2213/00 (EP,US);
B63B79/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Title | German: | NAVIGIERTES STÄDTISCHES SCHWIMMENDES BÜRO ODER WOHNSTRUKTUR FÜR UNABHÄNGIGE PARTEIEN | [2013/32] | English: | NAVIGATED URBAN FLOATING OFFICE OR RESIDENTIAL STRUCTURE FOR INDEPENDENT PARTIES | [2013/32] | French: | BUREAU OU STRUCTURE RÉSIDENTIELLE URBAINS FLOTTANTS APTES À LA NAVIGATION POUR OCCUPANTS INDÉPENDANTS | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 08.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.04.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5941192 (TAVONE JOHN H [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1, 2 * * column 1, line 19 - line 36 * | International search | [Y]US2003144889 (NIEMI PEKKA [FI]); | [Y]US2010138083 (KAJI HIROTAKA [JP]); | [Y]US2009105952 (GRACE TED V [US], et al) | by applicant | US3581692 | US2007056498 | JPH023591 | WO9920521 | FR2599706 | GB1297245 | US4732103 | US3964418 | JPS632789B | US6826478 | US6708113 | US6567743 | US5969665 | US5633644 | US5515287 | US5191341 | - A $70 MILLION VIEW, S.F. SELLER HOPES, (20080828), page C1 |