EP2629940 - A DEVICE FOR TRAVERSING AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states White Puma Pty Limited Suite 4, Level 3 20 George St Hornsby, New South Wales 2077 / AU | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYDEN, Gary James c/o Suite 4 Level 3 20 George St Hornsby New South Wales 2077 / AU | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2017/36] |
Former [2013/35] | Bradbury, Simon Timothy Nicholas, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11833621.3 | 19.10.2011 | [2017/36] | WO2011AU01326 | Priority number, date | US20100394764P | 19.10.2010 Original published format: US 394764 P | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012051649 | Date: | 26.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2629940 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2629940 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B25J15/00, B25J5/00, B25J19/00, A01G23/095, B26D7/02, B62D57/028, B62D61/00, B66F11/04, B62D7/02 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
A01G23/0955 (EP,US);
B25J5/005 (US);
B25J5/00 (EP,US);
B26D7/02 (EP,US);
B62D57/028 (EP,US);
B62D61/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/20] | B25J15/00, B25J5/00, B25J19/00, A01G23/095, B26D7/02, B62D57/028, B62D61/00, B66F11/04 | ||
Former IPC [2013/35] | B25J15/00, B25J5/00, B25J19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM DURCHQUEREN EINES OBJEKTS | [2013/35] | English: | A DEVICE FOR TRAVERSING AN OBJECT | [2013/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR PÉNÉTRER DANS UN OBJET | [2013/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 17.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 17.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2011 | AL | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | HR | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | MK | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | RS | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | SM | 06.09.2017 | LU | 19.10.2017 | MT | 19.10.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
MT | 19.10.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
MT | 19.10.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
MT | 19.10.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
MT | 19.10.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
MT | 19.10.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | HR | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | HR | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4893512 (TANIMOTO KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9,11,12,14,15 * abstract * * column 4, line 11 - line 54 * * column 5, line 5 - line 57 *; | [XA]JPH05261681 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND. LTD) [X] 1-4,6,7,11,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * [A] 5,10,13; | [X] - YISHENG GUAN ET AL, "Climbing gaits of a modular biped climbing robot", ADVANCED INTELLIGENT MECHATRONICS, 2009. AIM 2009. IEEE/ASME INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090714), ISBN 978-1-4244-2852-6, pages 532 - 537, XP031524155 [X] 1,2,6,8,9,11,14,15 * abstract * | [X] - CHANGHWAN CHOI ET AL, "The Design and Analysis of a Feeder Pipe Inspection Robot With an Automatic Pipe Tracking System", IEEE / ASME TRANSACTIONS ON MECHATRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20101001), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TMECH.2009.2032541, ISSN 1083-4435, pages 736 - 745, XP011345386 [X] 1-3,6,8,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMECH.2009.2032541 | [X] - FUKUDA T ET AL, "Path Planning And Control Of Pipeline Inspection And Maintenance Robot", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS SOCIETY, 1988. IECON '88. PROCEEDINGS., 14 ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF, IEEE, (19881024), doi:10.1109/IECON.1988.660413, pages 38 - 43, XP032286452 [X] 1,2,6,11,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IECON.1988.660413 | [X] - TAVAKOLI M ET AL, "3DCLIMBER: A climbing robot for inspection of 3D human made structures", INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS, 2008. IROS 2008. IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080922), doi:10.1109/IROS.2008.4651024, ISBN 978-1-4244-2057-5, pages 4130 - 4135, XP032335621 [X] 1,2,6,11,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.2008.4651024 | [X] - TIN LUN LAM ET AL, "Linear-time path and motion planning algorithm for a tree climbing robot â TreeBot", INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS (IROS), 2010 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101018), doi:10.1109/IROS.2010.5650347, ISBN 978-1-4244-6674-0, pages 4988 - 4994, XP031920349 [X] 1,2,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.2010.5650347 | International search | [X]US2482392 (WHITAKER ROLFE E); | [X]EP0542168 (ALCEGARDEN SRL [IT]); | [X]US2007181217 (AHDOOT NED [US]); | [YP]CN101898357 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH) |