EP2630881 - SYSTEM OF VISUAL MARKERS FOR FASTENING AND DIGITISING GARMENT PATTERNS, AND METHOD FOR DIGITISING GARMENT PATTERNS USING SAID VISUAL MARKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audaces Automação E Informática Industrial LTDA. ROD. SC 401 N.º 867 Bairro João Paulo 88030-000 Florianópolis / SC / BR | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALMEIDA RODRIGUES DE MORAES CAMARGO, Juliano Rua Manoel de Menezes 2201/CS15 Barra da Lagoa 88061-701 Florianópolis SC / BR | 02 /
BERTUOL, Guilherme Rod. Amaro Antonio Vieira 2489 apt. 604 Itacorubi 88034-101 Florianopolis SC / BR | 03 /
JEAN GRANDO, Michel Rua Heitor Luz 56 apto 1101 Centro 88015-500 Florianópolis SC / BR | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Ruo, Alessandro Ruo Patentes y Marcas SLP C/ Padre Recaredo de los Rios 30, entlo. 03005 Alicante / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Pereira Garcia, João Luís Simoes, Garcia, Core-Real & associates, Lda Rua Castilho, 167, 2° 1700-050 Lisboa / PT | Application number, filing date | 11833658.5 | 20.10.2011 | WO2011BR00394 | Priority number, date | BR2010PI04814 | 22.10.2010 Original published format: BR PI1004814 | [2013/35] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012051689 | Date: | 26.04.2012 | Language: | PT | [2012/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2630881 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 26.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A41H3/00, A41H1/06 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
A41H1/06 (EP);
A41H3/007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/35] | A41H3/00, A41H43/00, G06T17/00, G06K9/46, G06F19/00, G06T11/80, G06T15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR VISUELLE MARKIERUNGEN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG UND DIGITALISIERUNG VON KLEIDUNGSSCHNITTMUSTERN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR DIGITALISIERUNG VON KLEIDUNGSSCHNITTMUSTERN UNTER VERWENDUNG DIESER VISUELLEN MARKIERUNGEN | [2013/35] | English: | SYSTEM OF VISUAL MARKERS FOR FASTENING AND DIGITISING GARMENT PATTERNS, AND METHOD FOR DIGITISING GARMENT PATTERNS USING SAID VISUAL MARKERS | [2013/35] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MARQUEURS VISUELS POUR FIXATION ET NUMÉRISATION DE MODÈLES DE VÊTEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE NUMÉRISATION DE MODÈLES DE VÊTEMENT UTILISANT LESDITS MARQUEURS VISUELS | [2013/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2013 | Translation filed | 22.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 09.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2270604 (GERBER GARMENT TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 1,2 * figure 3 * [A] 3,4; | [YA]WO2006053411 (AUDACES AUTOMACAO E INFORMATIC [BR], et al) [Y] 1,2 * page 4, line 3 - line 7; figure 1 * [A] 3,4; | [A]EP1696383 (PSION TEKLOGIX SYSTEMS INC [CA]) [A] 1-4* figure 5 * | International search | [A]US2004227752 (MCCARTHA BLAND [US], et al); | [A]US2005119779 (AMICO JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2006210146 (GU JIN [CA]) | by applicant | US7031527 |