EP2655717 - WASHING MACHINE HAVING DRYING FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Sangwook LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 02 /
KO, Cheolsoo LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Hyojun LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11834546.1 | 22.09.2011 | WO2011KR06993 | Priority number, date | KR20100101758 | 19.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100101758 | KR20100101757 | 19.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100101757 | KR20100101756 | 19.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100101756 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012053746 | Date: | 26.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2655717 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D06F25/00, D06F58/24, D06F58/02, D06F37/22, D06F58/20 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
D06F25/00 (EP,CN,US);
D06F58/24 (EP,CN,US);
D06F37/22 (EP,CN,US);
D06F58/22 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/31] | D06F25/00, D06F58/24, D06F58/02, D06F37/22 | ||
Former IPC [2013/44] | D06F25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Title | German: | WASCHMASCHINE MIT TROCKNUNGSFUNKTION | [2013/44] | English: | WASHING MACHINE HAVING DRYING FUNCTION | [2013/44] | French: | MACHINE À LAVER DOTÉE D'UNE FONCTION DE SÉCHAGE | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 26.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/51] | 31.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2856699 (FREY EDWARD J) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE1808534 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGENAETE GMBH) [Y] 3* figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0704569 (MERLONI ANTONIO SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-15 * column 1 - column 3; figure 1 *; | [YA]EP1544342 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0184]; figure 19 * [A] 1,2,4-15; | [YA]EP1688531 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 12-15 * paragraph [0033]; figure 2 * [A] 1-11 | International search | [X]EP0704569 (MERLONI ANTONIO SPA [IT]); | [Y]EP1688531 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]US2008168679 (SON CHANG WOO [KR], et al) |