08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
20.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
27.11.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
28.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
20.12.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
17.12.2019 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
17.12.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.12.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
06.12.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
06.12.2019 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.12.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.12.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.07.2019 |
Change - German title |
published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] |
05.07.2019 |
Change - English title |
published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] |
05.07.2019 |
Change - French title |
published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] |
02.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.07.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.11.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.05.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.05.2017 |
First examination report |
|
04.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.12.2015 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] |
27.11.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] |
27.11.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] |
04.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
03.07.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
06.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.12.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] |
06.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.07.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
26.07.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
21.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.04.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|