Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9175375 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2015 | B2 | US2013209832 | 15.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011KR07914 | 21.10.2011 | KR20100103043 | 21.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5865377B | Global Dossier | 17.02.2016 | B2 | JP2013540207 | 31.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011KR07914 | 21.10.2011 | KR20100103043 | 21.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103270185B | Global Dossier | 10.08.2016 | B | CN103270185 | 28.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011KR07914 | 21.10.2011 | KR20100103043 | 21.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2631320 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2020 | B1 | EP2631320 | 30.12.2015 | A4 | EP2631320 | 28.08.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2011KR07914 | 21.10.2011 | KR20100103043 | 21.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012053871 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2012 | A9 | WO2012053871 | 02.08.2012 | A3 | WO2012053871 | 26.04.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20100103043 | 21.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101304850B | Global Dossier | 05.09.2013 | B1 | KR20120041546 | 02.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100103043 | 21.10.2010 |