EP2631320 - METAL-COATED STEEL SHEET AND HOT-DIP GALVANIZED STEEL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/35] | METAL-COATED STEEL SHEET, GALVANNEALED STEEL SHEET, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
[2019/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO 1, Koedong-dong Nam-gu Pohang Kyungsangbook-do 790-300 / KR | [2020/04] |
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states Posco 1, Koedong-dong Nam-gu Pohang Kyungsangbook-do 790-300 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Myung-Soo c/o Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Ju-Youn c/o Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Young-Ha c/o Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Jong-Sang c/o Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2020/04] |
Former [2013/35] | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11834671.7 | 21.10.2011 | [2020/04] | WO2011KR07914 | Priority number, date | KR20100103043 | 21.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100103043 | [2013/35] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012053871 | Date: | 26.04.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2631320 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2631320 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/06, C23C2/02, C23C28/00 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
C23C2/06 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/04 (US);
B32B15/043 (EP,KR,US);
C09D1/00 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/0224 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/026 (EP,KR,US);
C23C28/321 (EP,KR,US);
C23C28/345 (EP,KR,US);
C23C30/00 (EP,US);
C23C30/005 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/1259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12611 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12618 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12708 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12722 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12799 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12903 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1291 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12924 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12944 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/35] | C23C2/06, C23C2/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLBESCHICHTETES STAHLBLECH UND FEUERVERZINKTES STAHLBLECH | [2019/32] | English: | METAL-COATED STEEL SHEET AND HOT-DIP GALVANIZED STEEL SHEET | [2019/32] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER REVÊTUE DE MÉTAL ET TÔLE D'ACIER GALVANISÉE À CHAUD | [2019/32] |
Former [2013/35] | METALLBESCHICHTETES STAHLBLECH, FEUERVERZINKTES STAHLBLECH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2013/35] | METAL-COATED STEEL SHEET, GALVANNEALED STEEL SHEET, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
Former [2013/35] | TÔLE D'ACIER MÉTALLISÉE, TÔLE D'ACIER RECUITE APRÈS GALVANISATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2013 | Translation filed | 26.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 27.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 17.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2011 | AL | 22.01.2020 | AT | 22.01.2020 | CY | 22.01.2020 | CZ | 22.01.2020 | DK | 22.01.2020 | EE | 22.01.2020 | ES | 22.01.2020 | FI | 22.01.2020 | HR | 22.01.2020 | IT | 22.01.2020 | LT | 22.01.2020 | LV | 22.01.2020 | MC | 22.01.2020 | MK | 22.01.2020 | MT | 22.01.2020 | NL | 22.01.2020 | PL | 22.01.2020 | RO | 22.01.2020 | RS | 22.01.2020 | SE | 22.01.2020 | SI | 22.01.2020 | SK | 22.01.2020 | SM | 22.01.2020 | TR | 22.01.2020 | BG | 22.04.2020 | NO | 22.04.2020 | GR | 23.04.2020 | IS | 22.05.2020 | PT | 14.06.2020 | GB | 21.10.2020 | IE | 21.10.2020 | LU | 21.10.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 21.10.2011 | |
AL | 22.01.2020 | ||
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
GB | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.10.2011 | |
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
GB | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
GB | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
GB | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
GB | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 21.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 22.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH01119651 ; | [X]US5447802 (TOBIYAMA YOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract ** column 3, line 41 - column 5, line 59; figure 1b; examples 1-3; tables 3,7,11 *; | [X]JP2004209787 (JFE STEEL KK, et al) [X] 1,2,5 * Based on machine translation; paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0012] , [0042]; claim 1 *; | [XI]US2008283154 (TANIGUCHI HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] - [0014] - [0030] - [0034] - [0058] - [0066] - [0089] - [0097]; examples 2,4; tables 1,5 * [I] 3; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (19890511), vol. 1989, no. 25, Database accession no. 1989-182029, XP002740970 & JPH01119651 A 19890511 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * [I] 3 | International search | [A]JPH08188861 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPH10259468 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [X]JP2004209787 (JFE STEEL KK, et al); | [A]JP2010126758 (JFE STEEL CORP) | by applicant | JP2005200690 |