Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9471814 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2016 | B2 | US2013271266 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011AU01370 | 25.10.2011 | AU2010904767 | 26.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103154968 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011AU01370 | 25.10.2011 | AU2010904767 | 26.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011320020B | Global Dossier | 15.10.2015 | B2 | AU2011320020 | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011AU01370 | 25.10.2011 | AU2011320020 | 25.10.2011 | AU2010904767 | 26.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2633471 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | A4 | EP2633471 | 04.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011AU01370 | 25.10.2011 | AU2010904767 | 26.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012054974 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2010904767 | 26.10.2010 |