EP2634636 - POWER TRANSMISSION MECHANISM AND PROCESSING BOX CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ninestar Corporation Building 01/F2 & F7 Block B, Building 02 Building 03, Building 04/F1, F2, F3, F4, F5 Building 05, No. 3883, Zhuhai Avenue Xiangzhou District, Zhuhai Guangdong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | For all designated states Ninestar Corporation Building 01/F2 & F7 Block B, Building 02 Building 03, Building 04/F1, F2, F3, F4, F5 Building 05, No. 3883, Zhuhai Avenue Xiangzhou District, Zhuhai / CN | ||
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states Apex Technology Co., Ltd Building 01/F2 & F7B, Building 02 Building 03, Building 04/F1, F2, F3, F5 Building 05, No. 3883, Zhuhai Avenue Xiangzhou District Zhuhai Guangdong / CN | ||
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Zhuhai Seine Technology Limited No. 63, Mingzhu Road North Xiangzhou District Zhuhai Guangdong 519075 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Qingfei No.63 North Mingzhu Road Xiangzhou Zhuhai Guangdong 519075 / CN | 02 /
LIANG, Jun No.63 North Mingzhu Road Xiangzhou Zhuhai Guangdong 519075 / CN | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Hellmich, Wolfgang Lortzingstrasse 9 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11835585.8 | 27.09.2011 | WO2011CN80235 | Priority number, date | CN201110186826 | 05.07.2011 Original published format: CN201110186826 | CN201010537983 | 29.10.2010 Original published format: CN201010537983 | [2013/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012055312 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2634636 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00, F16D1/10 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
F16D1/108 (EP,US);
F16D1/10 (US);
G03G21/186 (EP,US);
F16D2001/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Title | German: | KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSMECHANISMUS UND VERARBEITUNGSBOX DAMIT | [2013/36] | English: | POWER TRANSMISSION MECHANISM AND PROCESSING BOX CONTAINING SAME | [2013/36] | French: | MÉCANISME DE TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE ET BOÎTIER DE TRAITEMENT LE CONTENANT | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2013 | Translation filed | 08.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 16.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/18] | 06.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002040875 (CANON KK) [X] 1,4,5,15 * abstract *; | [A]US2003059233 (JANG KYUNG-HWAN [KR], et al) [A] 1,3-5,7-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6173146 (WANG JUI-CHI [TW], et al) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2171544 (STATIC CONTROL COMPONENTS INC [US]) [A] 2,6,13 * paragraph [0025]; figures 1,17 *; | [A]JP2001324909 (CANON KK) [A] 11,12 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0066]; figures 23,24 * | International search | [Y]CN1179559 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]CN1188258 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]JP2002040875 (CANON KK); | [XP]CN201897693U (ZHUHAI SEINE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [XP]CN201945801U (ZHUHAI SEINE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) |