EP2645140 - OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTOR COMPONENT AND OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTOR PROVIDED WITH OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTOR COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adamant Namiki Precision Jewel Co., Ltd. 8-22, Shinden 3-chome Adachi-ku Tokyo 1238511 / JP | [2019/31] |
Former [2013/40] | For all designated states Adamant Kogyo Co., Ltd. 16-7 Shinden 1-Chome Adachi-Ku Tokyo 123-8595 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAUCHI, Isao c/o Adamant Kogyo Co. Ltd. 16-7, Shinden 1-chome Adachi-ku Tokyo 123-8595 / JP | 02 /
HYAKUTAKE, Yasuhiro c/o Adamant Kogyo Co. Ltd. 16-7, Shinden 1-chome Adachi-ku Tokyo 123-8595 / JP | 03 /
KANO, Satoshi c/o Adamant Kogyo Co. Ltd. 16-7, Shinden 1-chome Adachi-ku Tokyo 123-8595 / JP | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Wagner Albiger & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Leopold-Straße 27 53225 Bonn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Wagner, Matthias Müller-Gerbes Wagner Albiger Patentanwälte Friedrich-Breuer-Strasse 72-78 53225 Bonn / DE | Application number, filing date | 11835836.5 | 26.10.2011 | WO2011JP05980 | Priority number, date | JP20100244142 | 29.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010244142 | [2013/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012056691 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2645140 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/36, G02B6/38, G02B6/46, G02B6/52 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/3821 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/38 (KR);
G02B6/36 (KR);
G02B6/3624 (KR,US);
G02B6/3849 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/3869 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/3871 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/38875 (EP,US);
G02B6/475 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/54 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/45] | G02B6/36, G02B6/46, G02B6/38 | ||
Former IPC [2013/40] | G02B6/36, G02B6/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Title | German: | GLASFASERSTECKERKOMPONENTE UND GLASFASERSTECKER MIT DER GLASFASERSTECKERKOMPONENTE | [2013/40] | English: | OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTOR COMPONENT AND OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTOR PROVIDED WITH OPTICAL FIBER CONNECTOR COMPONENT | [2013/40] | French: | COMPOSANT DE CONNECTEUR DE FIBRE OPTIQUE ET CONNECTEUR DE FIBRE OPTIQUE COMPORTANT UN COMPOSANT DE CONNECTEUR DE FIBRE OPTIQUE | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2013 | Translation filed | 24.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 14.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/46] | Divisional application(s) | EP17193300.5 / EP3324227 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0758098 (MOLEX INC [US]); | [Y]US6130983 (CHENG YU-FENG [TW]); | [XY]US2002126961 (HIRABAYASHI KEN [JP], et al); | [Y]US2005185913 (INAMOTO TAKASHI [JP]); | [X]EP2031719 (DRAKA COMTEQ BV [NL]) | International search | [A]JP2003337258 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON); | [X]JP2005301151 (CANARE ELECTRIC CO LTD) | by applicant | WO2008036994 |