17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
07.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
12.10.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
14.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
07.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
27.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
03.11.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
27.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.09.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.09.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.05.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.03.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
24.03.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
28.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.05.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
02.10.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
02.10.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
30.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] |
08.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
02.08.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
27.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|