EP2634244 - CELL COLLECTION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cytogen Co., Ltd. A-dong 804 Kumkang Penterium IT Tower 333-7, Sangdaewon-dong Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 462-901 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Cytogen Co. Ltd. A-dong 804 Kumkang Penterium IT Tower 333-7, Sangdaewon-dong Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 462-901 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEON, Byung Hee 316-2401 Sangnok Maeul 122 Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 139-749 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Jong Kil 115-401 Wellconuty 1 Danji Apt. 9-31 Songdo-dong Yeonsu-gu Incheon 406-840 / KR | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Beier, Ralph V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Beier, Ralph V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11836589.9 | 25.10.2011 | WO2011KR07976 | Priority number, date | KR20100104250 | 25.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100104250 | KR20100104249 | 25.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100104249 | [2013/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012057497 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2634244 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/26, C12M1/12, B01D39/10, A61M1/34 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
C12M47/04 (EP,US);
G01N1/4005 (US);
A61M1/34 (US);
A61M1/341 (EP,US);
B01D39/10 (US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,US);
G01N2001/4016 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Title | German: | ZELLSAMMELVORRICHTUNG | [2013/36] | English: | CELL COLLECTION APPARATUS | [2013/36] | French: | APPAREIL DE COLLECTE DE CELLULES | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2013 | Translation filed | 26.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 19.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/09] | 15.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5043082 (HERMANN JR WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6 [I] 7-10; | [X]CN101329231 (ZHEN ZHANG [CN]) [X] 8-10 * the whole document *; | [E]EP2559999 (CYTOGEN CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-6* the whole document * | International search | [A]KR930023900U (PARK, YUN JONG); | [X]US5043082 (HERMANN JR WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [A]US5861094 (GOEHDE WOLFGANG [DE]); | [A]JP2006305517 (DENSO CORP) | by applicant | US2007025883 | US2009188864 |