Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013264272 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20100104249 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011KR07976 | 25.10.2011 | KR20100104250 | 25.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10473567 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2019 | B2 | US2017059460 | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615349922 | 11.11.2016 | KR20100104249 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011KR07976 | 25.10.2011 | US201313881719 | 27.06.2013 | KR20100104250 | 25.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101276187B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2013 | B1 | KR20120042531 | 03.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100104249 | 25.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101254677B | Global Dossier | 15.04.2013 | B1 | KR20120042532 | 03.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100104250 | 25.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5800910B | Global Dossier | 28.10.2015 | B2 | JP2013541958 | 21.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100104249 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011KR07976 | 25.10.2011 | KR20100104250 | 25.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103270150B | Global Dossier | 19.10.2016 | B | CN103270150 | 28.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100104249 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011KR07976 | 25.10.2011 | KR20100104250 | 25.10.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2634244 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | A4 | EP2634244 | 04.09.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20100104249 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011KR07976 | 25.10.2011 | KR20100104250 | 25.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012057497 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2012 | A3 | WO2012057497 | 03.05.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20100104249 | 25.10.2010 | KR20100104250 | 25.10.2010 |