EP2634714 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR EMOTIONAL AUDIO SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acriil Inc. (Nonhyeon-dong, 5F) 20, Eonju-ro 147-gil Gangnam-gu, Seoul 135-816 / KR | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Wei Jin Next Generation Media Laboratories MCS Logic 6F Samho Company LTD. B-Bldg., Yangjae 2-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-941 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Se Hwa Next Generation Media Laboratories MCS Logic 6F Samho Company LTD. B-Bldg., Yangjae 2-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-941 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jong Hee Next Generation Media Laboratories MCS Logic 6F Samho Company LTD. B-Bldg., Yangjae 2-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-941 / KR | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Thorniley, Peter Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Thorniley, Peter Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11836654.1 | 28.10.2011 | WO2011KR08123 | Priority number, date | KR20100106317 | 28.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100106317 | [2013/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012057562 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2634714 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/10, G10L13/033 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
G10L13/10 (EP,KR,US);
G06F40/242 (EP,KR,US);
G10L13/033 (KR,US);
G06F40/30 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/36] | G06F19/00, G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR EMOTIONALE TONSYNTHESE | [2013/36] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR EMOTIONAL AUDIO SYNTHESIS | [2013/36] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE AUDIO ÉMOTIONNELLE | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2013 | Translation filed | 28.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 28.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004107101 (EIDE ELLEN M [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6* the whole document *; | [X]US2006271371 (TSUBOI KAZUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2007208569 (SUBRAMANIAN BALAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0094] * | International search | [A]KR100241345B (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [Y]KR20050058949 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [X]KR20070090745 (IBM [US]) |