EP2632849 - SYNTHESIS, CAPPING AND DISPERSION OF NANOCRYSTALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pixelligent Technologies, LLC 6411 Beckley Street Baltimore, MD 21224 / US | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONEN WILLIAMS, Zehra, Serpil 9112 6th St. Lanham MD 20706 / US | 02 /
WANG, Yijun 412 Ridge Rd. Apt. 12 Greenbelt MD 20770 / US | 03 /
WIACEK, Robert, J. 575 Thayer Avenue 307 Silver Spring MD 20910 / US | 04 /
BAI, Xia 3425 Sundown Farms Way Olney MD 20832 / US | 05 /
GOU, Linfeng 408 Ridge Rd. Apt 11 Greenbelt MD 20770 / US | 06 /
THOMAS, Selina, I. 1905 Hamphire Drive Hyattsville MD 20783 / US | 07 /
XU, Wei 422 Ridge Rd. Apt. 11 Greenbelt MD 20770 / US | 08 /
XU, Jun 403 West Side Dr. Apt. 302 Gaithersburg MD 20878 / US | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Tezier Herman, Béatrice, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2013/36] | Application number, filing date | 11836987.5 | 26.10.2011 | WO2011US57822 | Priority number, date | US201113064905 | 25.04.2011 Original published format: US201113064905 | US20100407063P | 27.10.2010 Original published format: US 407063 P | [2013/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012058271 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2632849 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B82B3/00, B82B1/00, B82Y40/00, C30B7/10, C30B29/60, C30B29/16 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,CN,US);
B82B1/00 (CN,KR);
C30B29/16 (US);
B82B3/00 (CN,KR);
B82Y40/00 (EP,CN,US);
C01G25/006 (US);
C01G25/02 (US);
C01G27/006 (US);
C30B29/22 (US);
C30B33/00 (US);
C30B7/10 (US);
C30B7/14 (US);
H01B1/00 (EP,US);
H01L21/02554 (US);
H01L21/02601 (US);
H01L21/02628 (US);
H10K85/40 (US);
C01P2006/40 (US);
C01P2006/60 (US);
Y10S977/774 (EP,US);
Y10S977/896 (EP,US);
Y10S977/932 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/36] | B82B3/00, B82B1/00, B82Y40/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Title | German: | SYNTHESE, ABDECKUNG UND DISPERGIERUNG VON NANOKRISTALLEN | [2013/36] | English: | SYNTHESIS, CAPPING AND DISPERSION OF NANOCRYSTALS | [2013/36] | French: | SYNTHÈSE, COIFFAGE ET DISPERSION DE NANOCRISTAUX | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 11.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/42] | 12.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/42] | Divisional application(s) | EP17158404.8 / EP3190083 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.01.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002119304 (ARNEY DAVID S [US], et al); | [X]WO2008118422 (O'BRIEN STEPHEN [US], et al); | [X]US2009297626 (O'BRIEN STEPHEN [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2002004544 (KOLB BRANT U [US], et al); | [A]US2007287288 (PARK JIN-HWAN [KR], et al); | [X]KR100818195B (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]); | [A]WO2009045177 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG], et al) |