EP2571686 - CERAMIC MATRIX COMPOSITE STRUCTURES, COMPONENTS FORMED THEREWITH, AND METHODS OF PRODUCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLARD, Michael, Lee 1 Neumann Way MD H85 Cincinnati OH 45215 / US | 02 /
MEIBERS, Gregory, Joseph 1 Neumann Way MD M69 Cincinnati OH 45215 / US | 03 /
HALL, Kathleen, Raftery 1 Neumann Way MD M69 Cincinnati OH 45215 / US | 04 /
RENGGLI, Bernard, James 1 Neumann Way MD G52 Cincinnati OH 45215 / US | 05 /
MILLER, Jeffrey, Franklin 1 Neumann Way MD H326 Cincinnati OH 45215 / US | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Williams, Andrew Richard Global Patent Operation-Europe GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11837286.1 | 16.05.2011 | WO2011US36630 | Priority number, date | US20100345402P | 17.05.2010 Original published format: US 345402 P | US201113101231 | 05.05.2011 Original published format: US201113101231 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012118516 | Date: | 07.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2571686 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B32B18/00, C04B35/565, C04B35/80, C04B35/82, C04B37/00, C04B35/626, B64D33/04 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
B32B18/00 (EP,US);
B64D33/04 (EP);
C04B35/01 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/6263 (EP);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B35/82 (EP);
C04B37/001 (EP);
C04B37/008 (EP);
C04B37/021 (EP);
C04B37/028 (EP);
F01D5/282 (EP);
C04B2235/483 (EP);
C04B2235/522 (EP);
C04B2235/5244 (EP);
C04B2235/5256 (EP);
C04B2235/526 (EP);
C04B2235/616 (EP);
C04B2235/6567 (EP);
C04B2235/96 (EP);
C04B2237/062 (EP);
C04B2237/064 (EP);
C04B2237/32 (EP);
C04B2237/341 (EP);
C04B2237/343 (EP);
C04B2237/38 (EP);
C04B2237/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Title | German: | KERAMIKMATRIX-VERBUNDSTRUKTUREN, DARAUS GEFORMTE KOMPONENTEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/13] | English: | CERAMIC MATRIX COMPOSITE STRUCTURES, COMPONENTS FORMED THEREWITH, AND METHODS OF PRODUCING | [2013/13] | French: | STRUCTURES EN COMPOSITES À MATRICE EN CÉRAMIQUE, PIÈCES FORMÉES À PARTIR DE CELLES-CI, ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION | [2013/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 04.11.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4341826 (PREWO KARL M, et al) [X] 1,5,6,9-12,14,20 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 12; claims 1,8 *; | [X]US5153152 (DAWES STEVEN B [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9-12,14,20 * column 5, line 55 - column 7, line 13; table II * * column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 30 *; | [X]US5376598 (PREEDY KRISTINA S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-14,16,17,20 * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 3; example II; claims 4,5 * * column 1, lines 15-20 *; | [X]US4936939 (WOOLUM DALE E [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-12,14,16,17,19,20 * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 12 *; | [X]US5632834 (OSTERTAG ROLF [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-12,14,15,20 * column 3, line 30 - line 48; claim 1 *; | [A]US6228453 (FAREED ALI SYED [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 25, lines 30-33 *; | [X]US4450872 (ORCUTT DONALD R [US]) [X] 1,4-8,11,12,14,16,19,20 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 54 *; | [X]US2005097892 (CARPER DOUGLAS M [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9,11-15 * paragraph [0024]; claims 1,2,8,9 *; | [X]US2004175553 (BOUILLON ERIC [FR], et al) [X] 1,4-12,14,16,19,20 * example 1 *; | [X]US2005181192 (STEFFIER WAYNE S [US]) [X] 1,4-12,14,16,19,20 * example 1 * | by applicant | US5601674 |