EP2635880 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SPECTROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2022/39] |
Former [2019/36] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RADIVOJEVIC, Zoran 173 Wellbrook Way Cambridge CB3 0GL / GB | 02 /
ANDREW, Piers 102 Suez rd Cambridge CB1 3QD / GB | 03 /
BOWER, Christopher 4 Warwick Drive Ely CB6 3EN / GB | 04 /
KIVIOJA, Jani 9 Meadowsweet Close Cambridge CB23 6ET / GB | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2022/39] |
Former [2013/37] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 11837617.7 | 19.09.2011 | [2022/39] | WO2011FI50803 | Priority number, date | US20100939987 | 04.11.2010 Original published format: US 939987 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012059622 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2635880 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2635880 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 10.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/18, G02B6/10, G03B17/48 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
G01J3/0256 (EP,US);
G01J3/0205 (EP,US);
G01J3/0272 (EP,US);
G01J3/0291 (EP,US);
G01J3/1895 (EP,US);
G01J3/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEKTROMETRIEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2013/37] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SPECTROMETRY | [2013/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SPECTROMÉTRIE | [2013/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 15.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2019 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.09.2022 | AT | 28.09.2022 | CZ | 28.09.2022 | DK | 28.09.2022 | EE | 28.09.2022 | ES | 28.09.2022 | FI | 28.09.2022 | HR | 28.09.2022 | IT | 28.09.2022 | LT | 28.09.2022 | LV | 28.09.2022 | MC | 28.09.2022 | NL | 28.09.2022 | PL | 28.09.2022 | RO | 28.09.2022 | RS | 28.09.2022 | SE | 28.09.2022 | SI | 28.09.2022 | SK | 28.09.2022 | SM | 28.09.2022 | NO | 28.12.2022 | GR | 29.12.2022 | IS | 28.01.2023 | PT | 30.01.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
IT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5615008 (STACHELEK THOMAS M [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 13 - line 15 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 28 * * column 9, line 43 - line 60; figures 1,4 * [Y] 2-4[I] 11; | [XY]US2006279732 (WANG SEAN X [US], et al) [X] 1,5-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0 42] , [0 45] , [0 48]; figures 2a/b, 6 * [Y] 2-4 | International search | [A]US5446534 (GOLDMAN DON S [US]); | [A]US5615008 (STACHELEK THOMAS M [US]); | [A]WO03100469 (ALFRED E MANN INST BIOMED ENG [US]); | [A]US2005147342 (UCHIYAMA KENICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US2006279732 (WANG SEAN X [US], et al); | [A]US2006292039 (IIDA KAZUHIRO [JP]); | [A]WO2009070459 (ZHANG JINGYUN [US]); | [A]US2009295910 (MIR JOSE [US], et al); | [A] - ROWE, C. J. ET AL., "High reflectivity surface-relief gratings in single-mode optical fibers", IEE PROCEEDINGS, PART J, OPTOELECTRONICS, (1987), vol. 134, pages 197 - 202, XP008163078 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-j.1987.0035 | by applicant | US5615008 | US2006279732 |