EP2624464 - DISPLAY DEVICE, TRANSMITTING TERMINAL, RECEIVING TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI Tetsuyuki c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11837789.4 | 22.07.2011 | WO2011JP66701 | Priority number, date | JP20100246615 | 02.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010246615 | [2013/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012060136 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2624464 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/16, H04B1/04, H04N7/173, H04L12/28, H04W76/02, H04N21/4363 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
H04B7/24 (EP,US);
H04N21/43637 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/1423 (US);
H04N1/00209 (EP,US);
H04N21/4122 (US);
H04N21/43615 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/32] | H04B1/16, H04B1/04, H04N7/173 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, SENDEENDVORRICHTUNG, EMPFANGSENDVORRICHTUNG UND DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2013/32] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE, TRANSMITTING TERMINAL, RECEIVING TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2013/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE, TERMINAL D'ÉMISSION, TERMINAL DE RÉCEPTION ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2013 | Translation filed | 29.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 24.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 20.01.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/29] | 02.03.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4992866 (MORGAN JACK B [US]) [A] 1-4* abstract *; | [A]US2001049268 (KOBAYASHI MAKOTO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [I]EP2061247 (SHARP KK [JP]) [I] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] * | International search | [Y]JP2001197150 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]JP2001345817 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JP2006309583 (TOSHIBA CORP) | by applicant | JP2001197150 |