EP2636132 - VOICE COIL MOTOR AND DRIVING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 20th Fl. Seoul Square 541 Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 20th Fl. Seoul Square 541, Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Sangok 20th Fl. Seoul Square 541 Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2015/35] |
Former [2013/37] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 11838126.8 | 22.02.2011 | [2015/35] | WO2011KR01141 | Priority number, date | KR20100108427 | 02.11.2010 Original published format: KR 20100108427 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012060521 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2636132 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2636132 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02K33/18, G02B7/04, H02P7/06, G02B7/08, G02B7/09, H02K41/035, H02P25/02 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
G02B7/08 (EP,CN,US);
H02K33/18 (CN,KR,US);
H02K41/0356 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B7/04 (CN,KR);
G02B7/09 (KR,US);
G03B3/10 (KR);
H02K33/02 (KR);
H02K41/0354 (KR);
H02P25/034 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02P25/06 (CN);
H02P7/025 (KR);
H02P7/06 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2013/37] | H02K33/18, G02B7/04, H02P7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWINGSPULENMOTOR UND ANSTEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/37] | English: | VOICE COIL MOTOR AND DRIVING METHOD THEREOF | [2013/37] | French: | MOTEUR À BOBINE MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CELUI-CI | [2013/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15164805.2 / EP2963789 | EP19173754.3 / EP3557737 | EP21203175.1 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2011 | AL | 26.08.2015 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BE | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | HR | 26.08.2015 | IT | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | MK | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | RS | 26.08.2015 | SE | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | SM | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | NO | 26.11.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | IE | 22.02.2016 | LU | 22.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 22.02.2011 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 22.02.2011 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.02.2011 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.02.2011 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 26.08.2015 | |
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JP2008020668 (SHICOH ENG CO LTD); | [X]KR20080076841 (JOHNSON ELECTRIC SA [CH]); | [A]KR20090032905 (MUSTEK SYSTEMS INC [TW]); | [X]JP2009271204 (MINEBEA CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2009271204 |