|
25.08.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.09.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
16.09.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
26.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.12.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2014 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
09.07.2013 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
29.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |