Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
21.01.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.01.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
11.04.2014 | Supplementary search report | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
11.04.2014 | Change - classification | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
11.04.2014 | Change - classification | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
17.01.2014 | Change - extension states | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
30.11.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.08.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
23.08.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
09.07.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.06.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.05.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.06.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.06.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.05.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |