26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
09.11.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
14.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
07.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
03.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
01.12.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
29.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.10.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.10.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.07.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.05.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.02.2017 |
First examination report |
|
25.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.10.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
25.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
25.03.2016 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
27.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
03.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.08.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
23.08.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
17.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|