EP2640900 - CRASH CUSHION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Energy Absorption Systems, Inc. 2525 N. Stemmons Freeway Dallas, TX 75207 / US | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUEHLER, Michael, J. 1121 Cresthaven Drive Roseville, CA 95678 / US | 02 /
COX, Aaron, J. 1280 Emerald Oak Road Roseville, CA 95678 / US | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Claus Christian ZACCO NORWAY AS P.O.Box 2003 Vika 0125 Oslo / NO | [2013/39] | Application number, filing date | 11842117.1 | 11.11.2011 | WO2011US60344 | Priority number, date | US201113290550 | 07.11.2011 Original published format: US201113290550 | US20100413798P | 15.11.2010 Original published format: US 413798 P | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012067960 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2640900 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E01F15/00 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
E01F15/146 (EP,US);
E01F15/086 (US);
E01F15/08 (US);
E01F15/088 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | AUFPRALLPOLSTER | [2013/39] | English: | CRASH CUSHION | [2013/39] | French: | AMORTISSEUR D'IMPACT | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 22.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 23.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4815565 (SICKING DEAN L [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,11 * column 1, lines 6-16 * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 25 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 16 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6554529 (STEPHENS BARRY D [US], et al) [X] 1,8,14,18* the whole document *; | [XYI]EP1830003 (SPS SCHUTZPLANKEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10,13-17,19-23 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,11 [I] 12 | International search | [Y]US3112046 (GEORGE SZEKELY); | [Y]US3982734 (WALKER GRANT W); | [A]US5011326 (CARNEY III JOHN F [US]); | [Y]US6116805 (GERTZ DAVID C [US]); | [Y]US6554529 (STEPHENS BARRY D [US], et al); | [A]US7037029 (BUEHLER MICHAEL J [US], et al) | by applicant | US4815565 | US5011326 | US6092959 | US6427983 | US6554429 | US6554529 | EP1830003 |