12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
24.02.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
23.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
18.03.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
04.03.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.03.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.10.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
26.05.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.11.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
07.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
07.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
25.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.04.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
24.01.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
05.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
23.08.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
03.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|