EP2645108 - AUTOMATIC ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Tech Corporation 17-1, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | [2020/30] |
Former [2019/27] | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | ||
Former [2013/40] | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIGAKI Kenichi c/o Naka Division HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION 882 Oaza Ichige Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8504 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA Goro c/o Naka Division HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION 882 Oaza Ichige Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8504 / JP | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2019/27] |
Former [2013/40] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstraße 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11842660.0 | 22.11.2011 | [2019/27] | WO2011JP76879 | Priority number, date | JP20100263080 | 26.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010263080 | [2013/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012070557 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2645108 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2645108 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
G01N35/00584 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00346 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES ANALYSEGERÄT | [2013/40] | English: | AUTOMATIC ANALYZER | [2013/40] | French: | ANALYSEUR AUTOMATIQUE | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2013 | Translation filed | 17.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 18.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2019 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2011 | AL | 03.07.2019 | AT | 03.07.2019 | CY | 03.07.2019 | CZ | 03.07.2019 | DK | 03.07.2019 | EE | 03.07.2019 | ES | 03.07.2019 | FI | 03.07.2019 | HR | 03.07.2019 | IT | 03.07.2019 | LT | 03.07.2019 | LV | 03.07.2019 | MC | 03.07.2019 | MK | 03.07.2019 | MT | 03.07.2019 | NL | 03.07.2019 | PL | 03.07.2019 | RO | 03.07.2019 | RS | 03.07.2019 | SE | 03.07.2019 | SI | 03.07.2019 | SK | 03.07.2019 | SM | 03.07.2019 | TR | 03.07.2019 | BG | 03.10.2019 | NO | 03.10.2019 | GR | 04.10.2019 | IS | 03.11.2019 | PT | 04.11.2019 | GB | 22.11.2019 | IE | 22.11.2019 | LU | 22.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.11.2011 | |
AL | 03.07.2019 | ||
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
MT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
GB | 22.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.11.2011 | |
AL | 03.07.2019 | ||
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
GB | 22.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
GB | 22.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
GB | 22.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
GB | 22.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 03.07.2019 | |
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 03.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6673316 (OKAMOTO HIDEHO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 9 - column 12 *; | [A]WO2010021172 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* abstract * | International search | [X]JPH04190161 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [A]JPH10132828 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO, et al); | [A]JPH112631 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK); | [Y]JP2003121449 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP); | [A]JP2005181123 (OLYMPUS CORP) | by applicant | JP2003121449 |