EP2644658 - SOLID SOLUTION PIGMENT NANOPARTICLES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SOLID SOLUTION PIGMENT NANOPARTICLES HAVING CONTROLLED SOLID SOLUTION RATIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M Technique Co., Ltd. 2-16, Technostage 2-chome Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEKAWA Masaki c/o M. Technique Co. Ltd. 2-16 Technostage 2-chome Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP | 02 /
ARAKI Kaeko c/o M. Technique Co. Ltd. 2-16 Technostage 2-chome Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP | 03 /
OKA Hideyuki c/o M. Technique Co. Ltd. 2-16 Technostage 2-chome Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP | 04 /
HONDA Daisuke c/o M. Technique Co. Ltd. 2-16 Technostage 2-chome Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP | 05 /
ENOMURA Masakazu c/o M. Technique Co. Ltd. 2-16 Technostage 2-chome Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Sizer, Daniel Mark, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/48] | Sizer, Daniel Mark, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2013/40] | Robertson, James Alexander Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11843150.1 | 20.05.2011 | [2018/48] | WO2011JP61692 | Priority number, date | JP20100261863 | 24.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010261863 | [2013/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012070263 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2644658 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2644658 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/02, B82B3/00, C09B67/12, C09B67/22, C09B67/42 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C09B67/0097 (KR);
C07F3/06 (US);
B01D11/0269 (US);
B01F23/45 (US);
B82B3/00 (KR);
C07F1/08 (US);
C09B67/0016 (KR);
C09B67/0017 (EP,US);
C09B67/0019 (EP,US);
C09B67/0026 (EP,US);
C09B67/0033 (KR);
C09B67/0035 (EP,US);
C09B67/0071 (KR);
C09B67/0092 (EP,US);
C09C1/0081 (EP,US);
C09C1/04 (EP,US);
C09C1/627 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIGMENTNANOPARTIKEL IN EINER FESTEN LÖSUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PIGMENTNANOPARTIKELN IN EINER FESTEN LÖSUNG MIT GESTEUERTEM FESTLÖSUNGSVERHÄLTNIS | [2013/40] | English: | SOLID SOLUTION PIGMENT NANOPARTICLES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SOLID SOLUTION PIGMENT NANOPARTICLES HAVING CONTROLLED SOLID SOLUTION RATIO | [2013/40] | French: | NANOPARTICULES DE PIGMENTS EN SOLUTION SOLIDE ET MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION DE NANOPARTICULES DE PIGMENTS EN SOLUTION SOLIDE PRÉSENTANT UN RATIO DE LA SOLUTION SOLIDE RÉGULÉ | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2013 | Translation filed | 28.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 16.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2011 | AL | 28.11.2018 | AT | 28.11.2018 | CY | 28.11.2018 | CZ | 28.11.2018 | DK | 28.11.2018 | EE | 28.11.2018 | ES | 28.11.2018 | FI | 28.11.2018 | HR | 28.11.2018 | IT | 28.11.2018 | LT | 28.11.2018 | LV | 28.11.2018 | MC | 28.11.2018 | MK | 28.11.2018 | MT | 28.11.2018 | NL | 28.11.2018 | PL | 28.11.2018 | RO | 28.11.2018 | RS | 28.11.2018 | SE | 28.11.2018 | SI | 28.11.2018 | SK | 28.11.2018 | SM | 28.11.2018 | TR | 28.11.2018 | BG | 28.02.2019 | NO | 28.02.2019 | GR | 01.03.2019 | IS | 28.03.2019 | PT | 28.03.2019 | LU | 20.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 20.05.2011 | |
AL | 28.11.2018 | ||
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
MT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.05.2011 | |
AL | 28.11.2018 | ||
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 20.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 28.11.2018 | |
NO | 28.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001089682 ; | [X]JPH0572773 ; | [XD]JP2008201914 ; | [X]CN101376750 ; | [X]DE10020779 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * example - *; | [X]WO02092699 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-5 * example - *; | [D]JP2004528457 ; | [A]WO2009008388 (M TECH CO LTD [JP], et al)[A] 1; | [X]EP2055752 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * examples 1-5 *; | [A]EP2180021 (M TECH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 6-9 * abstract *; | [A]EP2204351 (M TECH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * example - *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 11, Database accession no. 2002-077517, XP002757037 & JP2001089682 A 20010403 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEM MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * example - * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 17, Database accession no. 1993-137479, XP002757038 & JPH0572773 A 19930326 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * example - * | [XD] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 64, Database accession no. 2008-K78398, XP002757039 & JP2008201914 A 20080904 (FUJI FILM CO LTD) [XD] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 34, Database accession no. 2009-F98440, XP002757074 & CN101376750 A 20090304 (FUJI FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * example - * | International search | [A]WO2006121016 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2009008388 (M TECH CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009074071 (FUJIFILM CORP) | by applicant | JP2004528457 | JP2008201914 | JP2009074071 |