EP2644757 - HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE SPINNING NOZZLE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8253 / JP | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIKI, Hiroyuki c/o Production Technology Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 02 /
SUMI, Toshinori c/o Production Technology Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 03 /
HIROMOTO, Yasuo c/o Production Technology Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 04 /
MAEHARA, Osamu c/o Production Technology Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 20-1 Miyuki-cho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA, Masahiro c/o Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 108-8253 / JP | 06 /
TERAMACHI, Masashi c/o Toyohashi Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 1-2 Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11843463.8 | 24.11.2011 | WO2011JP77088 | Priority number, date | JP20100261481 | 24.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010261481 | JP20110035631 | 22.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011035631 | JP20110045040 | 02.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011045040 | JP20110088187 | 12.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011088187 | JP20110100140 | 27.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011100140 | JP20110118086 | 26.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011118086 | [2013/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012070629 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2644757 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/24, B01D69/08, B01D69/12 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
B01D69/085 (EP,KR,US);
D01D4/02 (EP,KR,US);
B01D69/087 (EP,KR,US);
B01D69/12 (KR);
B29C48/11 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/29 (EP,KR,US);
D01D1/09 (EP,KR,US);
D01D4/06 (EP,KR,US);
D01D5/24 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Title | German: | HOHLFASERMEMBRAN-SPINNDÜSE SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE HOHLFASERMEMBRAN | [2013/40] | English: | HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE SPINNING NOZZLE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE | [2013/40] | French: | BUSE D'EXTRUSION DE MEMBRANE DE FIBRES CREUSES, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MEMBRANE DE FIBRES CREUSES | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2013 | Translation filed | 20.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 10.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE3022313 (NIPPON ZEON CO); | [XI]EP0430439 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [XI]EP0503783 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]WO03097221 (PARA LTD [KR], et al); | [A]US2006289350 (JI JIANG [US]) | International search | [X]JPS63105106 (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND); | [X]JP2007239147 (NOK CORP); | [Y]JP2008105014 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) |