|
08.08.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.06.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.04.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2014 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
31.05.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
31 |