EP2648490 - COMBINED-TYPE TARGET, NEUTRON GENERATING METHOD USING COMBINED-TYPE TARGET, AND NEUTRON GENERATING APPARATUS USING COMBINED-TYPE TARGET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8-, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2016/20] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Inter-University Research Institute Corporation High Energy Accelerator Research Organization 1-1, Oho Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0801 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Hiroshi c/o Inter-University Research Institute Corporation High Energy Accelerator Research Organisation 1-1 Oho Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0801 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Hitoshi c/o Inter-University Research Institute Corporation High Energy Accelerator Research Organisation 1-1 Oho Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0801 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIOKA, Masakazu c/o Inter-University Research Institute Corporation High Energy Accelerator Research Organisation 1-1 Oho Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0801 / JP | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA 3 chemin de l'Echo 1213 Onex Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 11844142.7 | 29.11.2011 | WO2011JP77557 | Priority number, date | JP20100264724 | 29.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010264724 | JP20110048187 | 04.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011048187 | JP20110113950 | 20.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011113950 | JP20110192030 | 02.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011192030 | [2013/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012073966 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2648490 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05H6/00, A61N5/10, G21K5/08, H05H3/06, H05H9/00 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
G21G4/02 (EP,US);
G21B3/006 (US);
H05H3/06 (EP,US);
H05H6/00 (EP,US);
A61N2005/002 (EP);
A61N2005/109 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTES TARGET, NEUTRONENERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG DES KOMBINIERTEN TARGETS UND NEUTRONENERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG DES KOMBINIERTEN TARGETS | [2013/41] | English: | COMBINED-TYPE TARGET, NEUTRON GENERATING METHOD USING COMBINED-TYPE TARGET, AND NEUTRON GENERATING APPARATUS USING COMBINED-TYPE TARGET | [2013/41] | French: | CIBLE DE TYPE COMBINÉ, PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE NEUTRONS À L'AIDE D'UNE CIBLE DE TYPE COMBINÉ ET APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION DE NEUTRONS À L'AIDE D'UNE CIBLE DE TYPE COMBINÉ | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2013 | Translation filed | 25.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 25.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 21.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 11.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2253255 (BARGMANN HEINZ [CH]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 40 - page 3, line 5 * * page 3, line 22 - line 26 *; | [XY]US4112306 (NUNAN CRAIG S) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 44 - line 55 * * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 36 * * figures 3, 5-7 * [Y] 5-7; | [Y]WO2006035424 (SOREQ NUCLEAR RES CT ISRAEL AT [IL], et al) [Y] 5-7 * page 6, line 8 - line 16 *; | [A] - E. Dunn, "Quarterly Report on the Medium-Energy Physics Program for the period ending April 30, 1973", USA, vol. LA-5358-PR, (197307), pages 1 - 51, Los Alamos Scientific Laboratory, URL: http://www.osti.gov/scitech/servlets/purl/4450255-lB4Qmf/, (20150625), XP002741406 [A] 1,2 * page 39, paragraph l - page 40, paragraph 1 * | International search | [A]JPS6435898 (SCI RES LAB INC); | [Y]JP2009047432 (UNIV KYOTO); | [X]JP2009204428 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | US4597936 | JP2000162399 | JP2003130997 | JP2006047115 | JP2006155906 | JP2006196353 | JP2007303983 | JP2008022920 | WO2008060663 | JP2009047432 | US2010067640 | - M. A. LONE, NUCL. INSTR. METH., (1977), vol. 143, page 331 | - YOSHIYUKI KIYANAGI; HIDEKI KOBAYASHI; HIROKATSU IWASA, "Neutronics of Coupled Liquid hydrogen Cold Neutron Source", BULLETIN OF THE FACULTY OF ENGINEERING, (19900730), vol. 151, pages 101 - 109 | - K. SHIBATA; 0. IWAMOTO; T. NAKAGAWA; N. IWAMOTO; A. ICHIHARA; S. KUNIEDA; S. CHIBA; K. FURUTAKA; N. OTSUKA; T. OHSAWA, "JENDL-4. 0: A New Library for Nuclear Science and Engineering", J. NUCL. SCI. TECHNOL., (2011), vol. 48, pages 1 - 30 |