EP2647863 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A CARBON-CERAMIC BRAKE DISK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/41] | CARBON-CERAMIC BRAKE DISK AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
[2019/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dacc Carbon 30, Unam-ro, Deokjin-gu Jeonju-si, Jeollabuk-do / KR | [2015/20] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states DACC Co. Ltd. 24-12, Sungju-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnamdo 641-120 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Junsang 4F Daejun Bldg. 810-10 Yeoksam-Dong Gangnam-Gu Seoul 135-080 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Hyunkyu 10-408 Daewoo Apt. 44-66 Sangnam-Dong Changwon-Si Gyeongsangnam-Do 641- 936 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Yeonho 101-804 Youngmu Yedaum Apt. 696 Deokjin-Dong 2-Ga Deokjin-Gu Jeonju-Si Jeollabuk-Do 561-192 / KR | 04 /
CHO, Chaewook 107-801 Drieum Apt. 316-1 Daejeong-dong Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 305-251 / KR | 05 /
KANG, Jungsuk 101-1407 Sinil Apt. Songcheon-Dong 1-Ga Deokjin-Gu Jeonju-Si Jeollabuk-Do 561-757 / KR | 06 /
IM, Dongwon 102-603 Geoseong Apt. 6/16, 623-1 Jinyeong-Eup Gimhae-Si Gyeongsangnam-Do 621-800 / KR | 07 /
CHEA, Byunggun 1556-8 Inhu-Dong 2-Ga Deokjin-Gu Jeonju-Si Jeollabuk-Do 561-232 / KR | 08 /
CHOI, Moonsoo 106-1502 Humansia Apt. Inhu-Dong 1-Ga Deokjin-Gu Jeonju-Si Jeollabuk-Do 561-231 / KR | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/01] |
Former [2013/41] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11844815.8 | 28.11.2011 | [2020/01] | WO2011KR09131 | Priority number, date | KR20100119413 | 29.11.2010 Original published format: KR 20100119413 | [2013/41] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012074263 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2647863 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2647863 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/12, C04B35/83 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
C04B35/62873 (EP,US);
C04B35/573 (EP,US);
C04B35/62886 (EP);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B37/005 (EP);
F16D65/12 (EP);
C04B2235/5264 (EP);
C04B2237/083 (EP);
C04B2237/385 (EP);
C04B2237/61 (EP);
F16D2065/132 (EP);
F16D2065/1328 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE KOHLENSTOFF-KERAMIK-BREMSSCHEIBE | [2019/28] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A CARBON-CERAMIC BRAKE DISK | [2019/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN DISQUE DE FREIN EN CARBONE-CÉRAMIQUE | [2019/28] |
Former [2013/41] | KOHLENSTOFF-KERAMIK-BREMSSCHEIBE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2013/41] | CARBON-CERAMIC BRAKE DISK AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
Former [2013/41] | DISQUE DE FREIN EN CARBONE-CÉRAMIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2013 | Translation filed | 11.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 28.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 22.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2019 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2011 | AL | 01.01.2020 | AT | 01.01.2020 | CY | 01.01.2020 | CZ | 01.01.2020 | DK | 01.01.2020 | EE | 01.01.2020 | ES | 01.01.2020 | FI | 01.01.2020 | HR | 01.01.2020 | LT | 01.01.2020 | LV | 01.01.2020 | MC | 01.01.2020 | MK | 01.01.2020 | MT | 01.01.2020 | NL | 01.01.2020 | PL | 01.01.2020 | RO | 01.01.2020 | RS | 01.01.2020 | SE | 01.01.2020 | SI | 01.01.2020 | SK | 01.01.2020 | SM | 01.01.2020 | TR | 01.01.2020 | BG | 01.04.2020 | NO | 01.04.2020 | GR | 02.04.2020 | IS | 01.05.2020 | PT | 27.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 28.11.2011 | |
AL | 01.01.2020 | ||
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.11.2011 | |
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 01.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH0559350 (IBIDEN CO LTD) [I] 1-6 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] *; | [X]US6030913 (HEINE MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 8 - line 54 *; | [I]US2008090064 (JAMES MARK C [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] ** paragraphs [0039] , [0040]; figure - * | International search | [Y]US5439080 (HANEDA ICHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2002510596 (DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG); | [Y]JP2002255665 (PORSCHE AG); | [A]JP2006151804 (NGK INSULATORS LTD, et al); | [A]US2009297707 (LA FOREST MARK [US], et al) |